EP1454504 - METHOD, APPARATUS AND ARRANGEMENT IN A TELECOMMUNICATIONS NETWORK FOR PROVIDING CONTROL OVER AND ENABLING ADVANCED SERVICES AND USER INTERFACES IN A MOBILE TELEPHONE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.11.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/02] | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2005/21] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2004/37] | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (publ) 126 25 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HÖGLANDER, Mats Rogestavägen 26 SE-139 36 Värmdö / SE | 02 /
ISAKSSON, Leif Slattervägen 82 S-135 42 Tyresö / SE | 03 /
ROXNÄS, Kjell Falkvägen 18 SE-468 33 Vargön / SE | [2004/37] | Representative(s) | Sjöberg, Mats Hakan Ericsson AB Patent Unit Core Networks, Älvsjö Box 1505 125 25 Älvsjö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/17] | Sjöberg, Mats Hakan Ericsson AB Patent Unit Core Networks, Älvsjö Box 1505 125 25 Älvsjö / SE | ||
Former [2004/37] | Lövgren, Tage ERICSSON AB Licensing and Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 01274787.9 | 20.11.2001 | [2004/37] | WO2001SE02568 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03045102 | Date: | 30.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1454504 | Date: | 08.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1454504 | Date: | 09.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 30.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/38, H04M3/42 | [2004/37] | CPC: |
H04W84/16 (EP,US);
H04M3/42314 (EP,US);
H04Q3/0025 (EP,US);
H04M2203/1091 (EP,US);
H04M2207/206 (EP,US);
H04M3/4234 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND ANORDNUNG IN EINEM TELEKOMMUNIKATIONSNETZ ZUR KONTROLLE UND ERMÖGLICHUNG VON ERWEITERTEN DIENSTEN UND BENUTZERSCHNITTSTELLEN IN EINEM MOBILTELEFON | [2004/37] | English: | METHOD, APPARATUS AND ARRANGEMENT IN A TELECOMMUNICATIONS NETWORK FOR PROVIDING CONTROL OVER AND ENABLING ADVANCED SERVICES AND USER INTERFACES IN A MOBILE TELEPHONE | [2004/37] | French: | PROCEDE, APPAREIL ET AGENCEMENT UTILISES DANS UN RESEAU DE TELECOMMUNICATIONS, DESTINES A CONTROLER ET A FOURNIR DES SERVICES AVANCES ET DES INTERFACES UTILISATEUR DANS UN TELEPHONE MOBILE | [2004/37] | Entry into regional phase | 08.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 08.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.05.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 08.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/37] | 04.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 09.01.2008 | GR | 10.04.2008 | PT | 09.06.2008 | [2010/47] |
Former [2009/33] | CY | 09.01.2008 | |
PT | 09.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | PT | 09.06.2008 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5550905 (SILVERMAN DAVID P [US]); | [X]GB2334403 (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA]); | [X]US6178183 (BUSKIRK JR MARTIN CORNELIUS [US]) |