EP1458329 - LOW SHRINKAGE DENTAL COMPOSITE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.11.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.12.2012 [2012/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bisco, Inc. 1100 West Irving Park Road Schaumburg, IL 60193 / US | [2004/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YIN, Rui 435 Cedar Court S. Buffalo Grove, IL 60193 / US | 02 /
SUH, Byoung, In 91 Livery Court Oakbrook, IL 60523 / US | 03 /
SHARP, Louis 733 North St. Mary's Road Libertyville, IL 60048 / US | 04 /
TIBA, Amer 522 East Algonquin Road 200 Schaumburg, IL 60173 / US | [2004/39] | Representative(s) | Neilson, Martin Mark, et al Murgitroyd & Company Leeds Studio 3 84 Albion Street Leeds LS1 6AG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/45] | Neilson, Martin Mark, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | ||
Former [2007/04] | O'Brien, Niall James, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 30 Welbeck Street London W1G 8ER / GB | ||
Former [2004/39] | Belcher, Simon James, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 01274795.2 | 20.11.2001 | [2004/39] | WO2001US43296 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03043589 | Date: | 30.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1458329 | Date: | 22.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61K6/083, A61K6/09 | [2004/39] | CPC: |
A61K6/893 (EP);
A61K6/20 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K6/20, C08L75/16 (EP);
A61K6/893, C08L75/16 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DENTALVERBUNDSTOFF MIT GERINGER SCHRUMPFUNG | [2004/39] | English: | LOW SHRINKAGE DENTAL COMPOSITE | [2004/39] | French: | COMPOSITE DENTAIRE A FAIBLE RETRAIT | [2004/39] | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 18.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/39] | 24.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/51] | 11.07.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/51] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.04.2006 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 22.09.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 22.09.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.10.2009 | Decision despatched | 12.02.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 12.02.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.02.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 05.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2006 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   29.03.2007 | 30.11.2007 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   18.02.2008 | 30.11.2011 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US6306927 (BLACKWELL GRODON B [DE], et al) [X] 1-5,8,16-19,22-25,30-33 * column 1, line 9 - column 2, line 45 * * column 3, line 8 - line 14 * * examples 1,11-13; claim - *; | [A]WO0130304 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [A] 1,10-19 * page 9, line 6 - line 7 * * page 15, line 12 - page 16, line 19 * * page 25, line 20 - line 30 * * table 4 *; | [A]EP0530926 (KANEBO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1,8-19 * page 3, line 16 - page 5, line 57 *; | [A]EP0345581 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 20 - page 4, line 26 *; | [A]EP0732099 (DEGUSSA [DE]) |