EP1454303 - PORTABLE DEVICE AND METHOD FOR ACCESSING DATA KEY ACTUATED DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.02.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bioscrypt Inc. 5450 Explorer Drive, Suite 500 Mississauga Ontario L4W 5M1 / CA | [2012/13] |
Former [2004/37] | For all designated states Bioscrypt Inc. 5450 Explorer Drive, Suite 500 Mississauga, Ontario L4W 5M1 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOLLINGSHEAD, Dennis W. Suite 200 1220 Sheppard Avenue East Toronto, Ontario M2K 2S5 / CA | [2012/13] |
Former [2004/37] | 01 /
HOLLINGSHEAD, Dennis W. Suite 200, 1220 Sheppard Avenue East Toronto, Ontario M2K 2S5 / CA | Representative(s) | Hall, Matthew Benjamin Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/13] | Hall, Matthew Benjamin Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2004/37] | Hall, Matthew Benjamin Frank B. Dehn & Co. 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 01274860.4 | 06.12.2001 | [2004/37] | WO2001CA01736 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03049042 | Date: | 12.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1454303 | Date: | 08.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1454303 | Date: | 28.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/13] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP1454303 | Date: | 12.09.2012 | [2012/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G07C9/00 | [2004/37] | CPC: |
G06Q20/10 (EP,US);
G07C9/257 (EP,US);
G06Q20/105 (EP,US);
G06Q20/40 (EP,US);
G07C9/00563 (EP,US);
H04L9/14 (EP,US);
H04L9/3231 (EP,US);
H04W12/068 (EP,US);
H04L2209/80 (EP,US);
H04L63/068 (EP,US);
H04L63/0861 (EP,US);
H04W12/02 (EP,US);
H04W12/04 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/37] | Title | German: | TRAGBARES GERÄT UND VERFAHREN FÜR DEN ZUGRIFF AUF PER DATENSCHLÜSSEL BETÄTIGTE VORRICHTUNGEN | [2004/37] | English: | PORTABLE DEVICE AND METHOD FOR ACCESSING DATA KEY ACTUATED DEVICES | [2004/37] | French: | DISPOSITIF PORTATIF ET PROCEDE D'ACCES A DES DISPOSITIFS COMMANDES PAR DES CLES DE DONNEES | [2004/37] | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.2004 | National basic fee paid | 01.07.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.07.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/37] | 23.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 15.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.08.2007 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2008 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   08.01.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.03.2012 | BE | 28.03.2012 | CY | 28.03.2012 | DK | 28.03.2012 | FI | 28.03.2012 | SE | 28.03.2012 | TR | 28.03.2012 | GR | 29.06.2012 | PT | 30.07.2012 | IE | 06.12.2012 | LU | 06.12.2012 | CH | 31.12.2012 | LI | 31.12.2012 | MC | 31.12.2012 | [2014/27] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 28.03.2012 | |
BE | 28.03.2012 | ||
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
TR | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
IE | 06.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 28.03.2012 | |
BE | 28.03.2012 | ||
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
IE | 06.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 28.03.2012 | |
BE | 28.03.2012 | ||
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
IE | 06.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 28.03.2012 | |
BE | 28.03.2012 | ||
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 28.03.2012 | |
BE | 28.03.2012 | ||
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 28.03.2012 | |
BE | 28.03.2012 | ||
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | BE | 28.03.2012 | |
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 30.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 28.03.2012 | |
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/46] | BE | 28.03.2012 | |
CY | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 28.03.2012 | |
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 28.03.2012 | |
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | GR | 29.06.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2181582 (BLACKWELL VICTOR CAMPBELL) [A] 1 * page 3, line 9 - page 4, line 9 * * claims 2,4,5,8 *; | [YA]US5131038 (PUHL LARRY C [US], et al) [Y] 1 * column 3, line 45 - column 5, line 45 * * column 6, line 15 - line 26 * * claim 1 * [A] 12,20,21,25; | [A]WO9812670 (DEW ENGINEERING & DEVELOPMENT [CA], et al) [A] 12 * page 7, line 27 - page 9, line 2 * * page 12, line 10 - line 25 * * page 16, line 5 - line 27 * * page 19, line 22 - page 20, line 2 *; | [A]EP0869460 (PITNEY BOWES INC [US]); | [YA]EP0924657 (TRW INC [US]) [Y] 1 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0031] * [A] 2-4,11,12,17-23 | by applicant | US5131038 | EP0924657 |