EP1134008 - Game system, game data exchange control method, game machine, and computer readable storage medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.01.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.02.2012 [2012/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Konami Digital Entertainment Co., Ltd. 7-2, Akasaka 9-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8324 / JP | [2008/25] |
Former [2002/46] | For all designated states Konami Corporation 4-1, Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6330 / JP | ||
Former [2001/38] | For all designated states Konami Corporation 3-1, Toranomon 4-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Izumi, Tadakatsu Konami C. E. Nagoya Co., Ltd, 1-13-3 Higashisakura Higashi-ku, Nagoya-shi, Aichi / JP | [2001/38] | Representative(s) | Brunner, Michael John Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/38] | Brunner, Michael John GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 01300028.6 | 03.01.2001 | [2001/38] | Priority number, date | JP20000010091 | 14.01.2000 Original published format: JP 2000010091 | [2001/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1134008 | Date: | 19.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1134008 | Date: | 09.10.2002 | [2002/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A63F13/12 | [2002/41] | CPC: |
A63F13/95 (EP);
A63F13/31 (EP,US);
A63F13/30 (US);
A63F13/35 (EP);
A63F13/79 (EP,US);
A63F13/85 (US);
A63F13/92 (EP);
A63F2300/204 (EP);
A63F2300/206 (EP);
A63F2300/40 (EP,US);
A63F2300/402 (EP);
A63F2300/50 (EP);
A63F2300/5546 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2001/38] | A63F13/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/27] |
Former [2001/38] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Spielsystem, Spieldatenaustauschkontrollverfahren, Spielmaschine, und computerlesbares Speichermedium | [2001/38] | English: | Game system, game data exchange control method, game machine, and computer readable storage medium | [2001/38] | French: | Système de jeu, procede de commande d'échange de données, machine de jeu, et support d'enregistrement lisible par ordinateur | [2001/38] | Examination procedure | 01.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/22] | 10.04.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 30.07.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 19.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/06] | 19.09.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.11.2004 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 15.05.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2011 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2163929 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD) [A] 1-7* figures 4,9,12,15,16B *; | [X]US6009458 (HAWKINS WILLIAM M [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-7 * column 2, line 35 - line 62 * * column 3, line 29 - line 38 * * column 16, line 28 - column 17 * * column 18, line 30 - line 52 * * figures 1,2,5,6,11 * |