EP1114990 - Apparatus for determining the position of a leak signal from a pipe [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.04.2004 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.06.2004 [2004/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Palmer Environmental Limited Ty Coch House, Llantarnam Park Way Cwmbran Gwent NP44 3AW / GB | [2001/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Williams, Andrew John, Palmer Environmental Ltd. Ty Coch House, Llantarnam Park Way Cwmbran NP44 3AW / GB | 02 /
Roy, Keith John, Palmer Environmental Limited Ty Coch House, Llantarnam Park Way Cwmbran NP44 3AW / GB | [2001/28] | Representative(s) | Granleese, Rhian Jane Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/28] | Granleese, Rhian Jane Marks & Clerk, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 01300044.3 | 04.01.2001 | [2001/28] | Priority number, date | GB20000000097 | 05.01.2000 Original published format: GB 0000097 | [2001/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1114990 | Date: | 11.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1114990 | Date: | 05.02.2003 | [2003/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G01M3/24 | [2001/28] | CPC: |
G01M3/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/43] |
Former [2001/28] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Apparat zur Feststellung der Position eines Rohr-Lecksignals | [2001/28] | English: | Apparatus for determining the position of a leak signal from a pipe | [2001/28] | French: | Appareil pour determiner la position d'un signal de fuite d'un tuyau | [2001/28] | Examination procedure | 06.08.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/23] | 29.12.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 22.09.2003 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2004 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5974862 (LANDER PAUL [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * claims 1-27 *; | [Y]US3903729 (COVINGTON MORRIS T) [Y] 1-12 * claims 1-13 *; | [Y]US5548530 (BAUMOEL JOSEPH [US]) [Y] 13 * column 4 - column 6 *; | [Y]US5227762 (GUIDETTE DAVID [US], et al) [Y] 13 * claims 1,30 *; | [A]US5058419 (NORDSTROM KARI N [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * claims 1-32 *; | [A]US5205173 (ALLEN TREVOR J [GB]) [A] 1,13 * claims 1-9 *; | [A]EP0552044 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1-13 * page 4 - page 9 *; | [A]US4457163 (JAECKLE EUGEN [DE]) [A] 1,13 * claims 1,2 *; | [A]JPS63108240 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880922), vol. 012, no. 354, Database accession no. (P - 761), & JP63108240 A 19880513 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * |