EP1119151 - Method and apparatus for analyzing one or more firewalls [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2008 | Change - representative | published on 12.11.2008 [2008/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/30] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mayer, Alain 230 E 48th Street, Apt. 6F New York, NY 10017 / US | 02 /
Wool, Avishai 45 Fellswood Drive Livingston, NJ 07039 / US | 03 /
Ziskind, Elisha 39 Humbert Street, Apt. 1 Princeton, NJ 08542 / US | [2001/30] | Representative(s) | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Ltd Patent Business c/o Nokia 125 Finsbury Pavement London EC2A 1NQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/46] | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Limited Unit 18, Core 3, Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield EN3 7XU / GB | ||
Former [2006/09] | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Lucent Technologie NS UK Limited 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB | ||
Former [2001/30] | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, Dr., et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 01300123.5 | 08.01.2001 | [2001/30] | Priority number, date | US20000483876 | 18.01.2000 Original published format: US 483876 | [2001/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1119151 | Date: | 25.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1119151 | Date: | 21.01.2004 | [2004/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1119151 | Date: | 01.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04L12/24, H04L12/22 | [2001/30] | CPC: |
H04L41/145 (EP,US);
H04L41/0853 (EP,US);
H04L41/12 (EP,US);
H04L63/0263 (EP,US);
H04L63/20 (EP,US);
H04L63/1433 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/42] |
Former [2001/30] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Analysieren von einer oder mehrerer Firewalls | [2005/02] | English: | Method and apparatus for analyzing one or more firewalls | [2001/30] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour analyser un ou plusieurs garde-barrières | [2001/30] |
Former [2001/30] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Analysieren von einem oder mehreren Firewalls | Examination procedure | 13.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/38] | 09.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 01.06.2005 | [2007/36] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5726979 (HENDERSON GREGORY SCOTT [US], et al) [A] 9,10,28,29 * abstract * * column 2, line 30 - column 4, line 32 * * column 13, line 66 - column 14, line 34 *; | [A]EP0854605 (SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 9,10,28,29 * abstract * * column 4, line 53 - column 6, line 10 *; | [X]US5968176 (NESSETT DANNY M [US], et al) [X] 9,10,28,29 * abstract * * column 4, line 1 - line 14 * * column 4, line 51 - column 5, line 63 * * column 7, line 65 - column 9, line 5 * * column 9, line 42 - column 10, line 16 * * column 17, line 54 - line 65 * * column 18, line 66 - column 19, line 27 * * column 19, line 49 - column 20, line 7 *; | [X] - HINRICHS S, "Policy-based management: bridging the gap", COMPUTER SECURITY APPLICATIONS CONFERENCE, 1999. (ACSAC '99). PROCEEDINGS. 15TH ANNUAL PHOENIX, AZ, USA 6-10 DEC. 1999, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19991206), ISBN 0-7695-0346-2, pages 209 - 218, XP010368586 [X] 9,10,28,29 * page 211, paragraphs 3.1-3.1.1 * * page 212, paragraph 3.3 * * page 213, paragraph 3.4 * * page 214, paragraph 4.1 - page 215, paragraph 4.1 * * figures 2,3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CSAC.1999.816030 | [T] - MAYER A ET AL, "Fang: a firewall analysis engine", SECURITY AND PRIVACY, 2000. S&P 2000. PROCEEDINGS. 2000 IEEE SYMPOSIUM ON BERKELEY, CA, USA 14-17 MAY 2000, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (20000514), ISBN 0-7695-0665-8, pages 177 - 187, XP010501134 [T] 1-29 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/SECPRI.2000.848455 |