EP1116657 - Equatorial-normal body-stabilized spacecraft and control method for inclined orbit operation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.07.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.09.2003 [2003/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Space Systems / Loral, Inc. 3825 Fabian Way Palo Alto California 94303 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/29] | For all designated states Space Systems / Loral, Inc. 3825 Fabian Way Palo Alto, California 94303 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Turner, Andrew E 1662 Alison Avenue Mountain View, California 94040 / US | 02 /
Stoen, Jeffrey D 2102 Princeton Street Palo Alto, California 94306 / US | 03 /
Ford, David F 233 Sundance Lane Waltsonville, California 95076 / US | [2001/29] | Representative(s) | Greene, Simon Kenneth, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/29] | Greene, Simon Kenneth, et al Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 01300135.9 | 08.01.2001 | [2001/29] | Priority number, date | US20000480066 | 10.01.2000 Original published format: US 480066 | [2001/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1116657 | Date: | 18.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1116657 | Date: | 14.08.2002 | [2002/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B64G1/10, B64G1/24, G05D1/08, H04B7/195 | [2002/33] | CPC: |
B64G1/242 (EP,US);
B64G1/1007 (EP,US);
B64G1/244 (EP,US);
B64G1/66 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/29] | B64G1/10, B64G1/24, G05D1/08 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2003/19] |
Former [2001/29] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Äquatorial-normal, stabilisiertes Raumfahrzeug und Lageregelungsverfahren für schiefe Umlaufbahnen | [2001/29] | English: | Equatorial-normal body-stabilized spacecraft and control method for inclined orbit operation | [2001/29] | French: | Engin spatial stabilisé sur une orientation normale à l'équateur et méthode de contrôle pour son opération sur une orbite inclinée | [2001/29] | Examination procedure | 29.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/14] | 27.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]US6076773 (SALVATORE JEREMIAH O [US]) [PX] 1-4,7-10 * figure 6 * * column 7, line 11 - line 40 * * column 7, line 63 - column 8, line 37 *; | [Y] - NAUCK J ET AL, "THE LOOPUS CONCEPT AND ITS APPLICATIONS", ZEITSCHRIFT FUR FLUGWISSENSCHAFTEN UND WELTRAUMFORSCHUNG, DFVLR. KOLN, DE, (19880501), vol. 12, no. 3, ISSN 0342-068X, pages 191 - 196, XP000034940 [Y] 1-11 * page 193, column 2, paragraph L - page 194, column 1, paragraph 1 * * figure 7 * | [Y] - RENNER U ET AL, "A SUN-POINTING COMMUNICATIONS SATELLITE", ESA BULLETIN, EUROPEAN SPACE RESEARCH AND TECNOLOGY CENTRE,, NL, (198405), no. 38, ISSN 0376-4265, pages 12 - 16, XP001011486 [Y] 1-11 * page 12, column 1, paragraph 1 - paragraph 3 * * figures 1,2 * | [Y] - WERTZ J R (ED.), Spacecraft Attitude Determination and Control, DORDRECHT, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, (1978), 193230, XP002202502 [Y] 2-5,8-11 * page 201 - page 210 * |