EP1116494 - System and method for automatic atrial capture detection and atrial pacing treshold determination [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.12.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.01.2005 [2005/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PACESETTER, INC. 15900 Valley View Court Sylmar, CA 91342-9221 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/29] | For all designated states Pacesetter, Inc. 15900 Valley View Court Sylmar, CA 91342-9221 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bornzin, Gene A. 608 Stonebrook Simi Valley, CA 93065 / US | 02 /
Levine, Paul A. 23452 Windcrest Place Newhall, CA 91321 / US | 03 /
Valikai, Kenneth 27226 Sunnyridge Road Palos Verdes Pen., CA 90274 / US | 04 /
Sholder, Jason A. 40 Marlin Drive Whippany, NJ 07981 / US | [2001/29] | Representative(s) | Rees, David Christopher, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/29] | Rees, David Christopher, et al Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01300176.3 | 10.01.2001 | [2001/29] | Priority number, date | US20000481748 | 11.01.2000 Original published format: US 481748 | [2001/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1116494 | Date: | 18.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1116494 | Date: | 02.07.2003 | [2003/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/368, A61N1/37 | [2001/29] | CPC: |
A61N1/3712 (EP,US);
A61N1/3714 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IE, IT [2004/43] |
Former [2004/13] | CH, DE, FR, IE, IT, LI | ||
Former [2001/29] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur automatischen Erfassung des atrialen Einfanges und zur Bestimmung des Schwellwertes der atrialen Stimulation | [2001/29] | English: | System and method for automatic atrial capture detection and atrial pacing treshold determination | [2001/29] | French: | Procedé et appareil de détection automatique de la capture auriculaire et détermination du seuil de stimulation auriculaire | [2001/29] | Examination procedure | 29.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/10] | 02.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CY, DK, ES, FI, GB, GR, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 13.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/03] | 13.07.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.08.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.02.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0776233 (MEDTRONIC INC [US]) [Y] 1-5,7 * column W *; | [Y]WO9832489 (PACESETTER INC [US]) [Y] 1-5,7 * column W *; | [A]US5741312 (VONK BERNARDUS F M [NL], et al) [A] 1,2 * column W *; | [A]EP0876827 (VITATRON MEDICAL BV [NL]) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A]EP0904802 (PACESETTER INC [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document * |