EP1118693 - Suspended gas distribution manifold for plasma chamber [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.11.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 07.05.2008 [2008/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Applied Materials, Inc. 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/01] | For all designated states APPLIED MATERIALS, INC. 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | ||
Former [2001/30] | For all designated states Applied Materials, Inc. 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
White, John M. 2811 Colony View Place Hayward, California 94541 / US | 02 /
Keller, Ernst 259 Leota Avenue Sunnyville, California 94086 / US | 03 /
Blonigan, Wendell T. 32478 Monterey Drive Union City, California 94587 / US | [2001/30] | Representative(s) | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/30] | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 01300380.1 | 17.01.2001 | [2001/30] | Priority number, date | US20000488612 | 20.01.2000 Original published format: US 488612 | [2001/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1118693 | Date: | 25.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1118693 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | [2001/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1118693 | Date: | 03.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/455, C23C16/509 | [2001/30] | CPC: |
C23C16/45565 (EP,KR,US);
C23C16/455 (EP,US);
C23C16/5096 (EP,KR,US);
H01J37/3244 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/67069 (KR);
Y10T29/49428 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49826 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [2002/27] |
Former [2001/30] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Hängende Gasverteilungvorrichtung für Plasmakammer | [2001/30] | English: | Suspended gas distribution manifold for plasma chamber | [2001/30] | French: | Unité de distribution de gaz suspendue pour chambre à plasma | [2001/30] | Examination procedure | 22.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/23] | 10.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.01.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 25.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/50] | Request for further processing for: | 25.02.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 25.02.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.03.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 03.01.2007 | GB | 03.04.2007 | [2008/19] |
Former [2008/01] | BE | 03.01.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9533866 (MATERIALS RESEARCH CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-35 * page 24, line 15 - page 25, line 15 * * page 33, lines 3-21; figures 2,2A *; | [A]US5567243 (FOSTER ROBERT F [US], et al) [A] 1-35 * column 14, line 49 - column 17, line 47; figures 2,2A *; | [A]US5647911 (VANELL JAMES [US], et al) [A] 28-35 * column 5, lines 40-65; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0843348 (APPLIED MATERIALS INC [US]) [A] 28-35* page 17, line 44 - page 18, line 19; figure 5 *; | [A]WO9925012 (TOKYO ELECTRON LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-35 * page 9, line 4 - page 10, line 23; figure 1 *; | [A]WO9925895 (SYMETRIX CORP [US]) [A] 1-35 * page 22, lines 3-16 * * page 23, lines 2-5 * * page 25, lines 1-17; figures 8-11 * |