EP1130511 - Data transfer and synchronization system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 11.03.2011 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.2011 | Refusal of application | published on 13.04.2011 [2011/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states fusionOne, Inc. 55 Almaden Boulevard - Suite 800 San Jose California 95113 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/36] | For all designated states FusionOne, Inc. 55 Almaden Boulevard - Suite 800 San Jose, California 95113 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Multer, David L. 32 Eastridge Drive Santa Cruz, California 95060 / US | [2001/36] | Representative(s) | Harris, Ian Richard, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/44] | Harris, Ian Richard, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2001/36] | Butler, Michael John Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 01300672.1 | 25.01.2001 | [2001/36] | Priority number, date | US20000490550 | 25.01.2000 Original published format: US 490550 | US20000491675 | 26.01.2000 Original published format: US 491675 | US20000491694 | 26.01.2000 Original published format: US 491694 | [2001/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1130511 | Date: | 05.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1130511 | Date: | 07.04.2004 | [2004/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/46 | [2001/36] | CPC: |
G06F16/275 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/36] | Title | German: | Datenübertragungs- und Synchronisierungssystem | [2001/36] | English: | Data transfer and synchronization system | [2001/36] | French: | Système de transfert de données et de synchronisation | [2001/36] | Examination procedure | 07.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/50] | 13.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.11.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 08.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2007 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.12.2007 | 03.12.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 12.12.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.12.2007 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 05.02.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2011/15] | 28.10.2010 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2011/15] | Appeal following examination | 14.04.2008 | Appeal received No. T1266/08 | 16.06.2008 | Statement of grounds filed | 28.10.2010 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 27.10.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.11.2010 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Request for further processing for: | 08.02.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 08.02.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.03.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2005 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   28.07.2005 | 31.01.2006 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   04.07.2006 | 31.01.2007 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   13.07.2007 | 31.01.2008 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   15.07.2008 | 31.01.2011 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5392390 (CROZIER KEITH [US]) [X] 1-42 * abstract * * column 1, lines 19-60 * * column 3, line 5 - column 4, line 13 * * column 4, line 54 - column 5, line 16 * * column 7, lines 11-60 * * column 13, lines 16-28 * * column 16, lines 8-12 * * claims 1-3,7-9 *; | [A]US5706509 (MAN-HAK TSO MICHAEL [US]) [A] 1-42 * abstract * * column 1, line 7 - column 2, line 67 * * column 3, line 50 - column 5, line 23 * * column 6, line 43 - column 7, line 50 * * column 13, lines 40-47 * * claims 1-3,5,6 *; | [X]WO9854662 (ARKONA INC [US]) [X] 1-42 * abstract * * page 1, lines 8-27 * * page 3, lines 16-31 * * page 4, lines 5-36 * * page 7, line 30 - page 8, line 33 * * page 10, line 18 - page 11, line 22 * * page 15, lines 6-25 * * page 16, line 14 - page 17, line 22 * * claims 1,2,5,7,9-11 *; | [A]US5884323 (HAWKINS JEFFREY C [US], et al) [A] 1-42 * abstract * * column 1, lines 6-22 * * column 2, line 52 - column 3, line 17 * * column 3, line 51 - column 4, line 49 * * column 6, lines 2-62 ** claims 1,3,4 * | Examination | US5926816 | by applicant | US5926816 |