EP1120967 - Digital contents distribution system, digital contents distribution method, data conversion server, information processor and information processing method, system for property right protection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.04.2011 [2011/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2010/10] |
Former [2001/31] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Inoue, Hiroshi Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Yokomizo, Yoshikazu Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Ando, Tsutomu Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2001/31] | Representative(s) | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Canon Europe Ltd European Patent Department 3 The Square Stockley Park Uxbridge Middlesex UB11 1ET / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Canon Europe Limited 6 Roundwood Avenue Stockley Park Uxbridge UB11 1JA / GB | ||
Former [2008/24] | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Canon Europe Ltd. European Patent Department 6 Roundwood Avenue Stockley Park Middlesex, Uxbridge UB11 1JA / GB | ||
Former [2001/31] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. High Holborn 2-5 Warwick Court London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01300727.3 | 26.01.2001 | [2001/31] | Priority number, date | JP20000020041 | 28.01.2000 Original published format: JP 2000020041 | [2001/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1120967 | Date: | 01.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1120967 | Date: | 07.11.2001 | [2001/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1120967 | Date: | 10.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/24 | [2001/31] | CPC: |
H04N21/835 (EP,US);
H04L9/00 (KR);
H04N21/23412 (EP,US);
H04N21/234318 (EP,US);
H04N21/235 (EP,US);
H04N21/2389 (EP,US);
H04N21/2541 (EP,US);
H04N21/43074 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/435 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2002/30] |
Former [2001/31] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | System zum Verteilen von Digitalinhalten, Verfahren zum Verteilen von Digitalinhalten, Server zum Konvertieren von Daten, Datenprozessor und Informationsverarbeitungsverfahren, System zum Schutz von Eigentumsrechten | [2010/10] | English: | Digital contents distribution system, digital contents distribution method, data conversion server, information processor and information processing method, system for property right protection | [2001/31] | French: | Système et méthode de distribution de contenu, serveur de conversion de données, processeur d'information et méthode pour le traitement d'information, système de protection des droits de propriété | [2001/31] |
Former [2001/31] | System zum Verteilen von digitalen Inhalten, Verfahren zum Verteilen von digitalen Inhalten, Server zum Konvertieren von Daten, Datenprozessor und Informationsverarbeitungsverfahren, System zur Erlangung von Schutzrechten | Examination procedure | 27.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/23] | 22.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.11.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 22.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/07] | Request for further processing for: | 18.01.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 18.01.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.02.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 01.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 10.03.2010 | NL | 10.03.2010 | [2011/14] |
Former [2010/45] | NL | 10.03.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0666694 (GEN INSTRUMENT CORP [US]) [X] 1,13,22,33,42-49 * abstract *; | [AY]EP0969668 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-49 * the whole document * [Y] 50-65; | [A]WO9948296 (INTERTRUST TECH CORP [US]) [A] 1-65 * abstract *; | [A]WO0004717 (THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS [US], et al) [A] 1-65 * abstract *; | [A]US5675782 (MONTAGUE DAVID S [US], et al) [A] 1,13,22,33,42-49 * abstract *; | [A]EP0477039 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1,13,22,33,42-49 * abstract *; | [A]WO9945456 (NETWORK APPLIANCE INC [US]) [A] 1,13,22,33,42-49 * abstract *; | [Y] - "OPIMA Specification Version 1.0", OPIMA - OPEN PLATFORM INITIATIVE FOR MULTIMEDIA ACCESS, Turin, XP002176279 [Y] 50-65 * Section 2 "The Opima Architecture (informative)" on pages 6-9 * * Section 3.3.3.2 "getIpmpSystem" on page 14 * * Section 3.3.3.3 "queryOVM" on page 14 * | [A] - CASALINO F ET AL, "MPEG-4 systems, concepts and implementation", LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE, SPRINGER VERLAG, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19980526), ISSN 0302-9743, pages 504 - 517, XP002120837 [A] 1-65 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/3-540-64594-2_119 | [A] - "FUNCTIONAL MODEL OF A CONDITIONAL ACCESS SYSTEM", EBU REVIEW- TECHNICAL, EUROPEAN BROADCASTING UNION. BRUSSELS, BE, (19951221), no. 266, ISSN 0251-0936, pages 64 - 77, XP000559450 [A] 1,13,22,33,42-49 * page 74, paragraph 5.4 * |