EP1120042 - Biodegradable packaging material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.01.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.03.2004 [2004/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Green Light Packaging Limited 21 Bryant Way Toddington Bedfordschire LU5 6EX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/31] | For all designated states Green Light Packaging Limited 21 Bryant Way Toddington, Bedfordschire LU5 6EX / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yeo, Bruce 21 Bryant Way Toddington, Bedfordshire LU5 6EX / GB | [2001/31] | Representative(s) | Marlow, Nicholas Simon Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/31] | Marlow, Nicholas Simon Reddie & Grose 16, Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 01300735.6 | 29.01.2001 | [2001/31] | Priority number, date | GB20000001940 | 27.01.2000 Original published format: GB 0001940 | [2001/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1120042 | Date: | 01.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1120042 | Date: | 10.09.2003 | [2003/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A21D8/02, A21D2/00, A21D2/14, A21D2/16, A21D6/00, B65D65/46, B65D81/09 | [2003/36] | CPC: |
A21D8/02 (EP);
A21D2/00 (EP);
A21D2/165 (EP);
A21D6/00 (EP);
A23L7/17 (EP);
B65D65/466 (EP);
Y02W90/10 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2001/31] | A21D8/02, A21D2/00, A21D2/14, A21D2/16, A21D6/00, B65D65/46 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Biologisch abbaubarer Verpackungswerkstoff | [2001/31] | English: | Biodegradable packaging material | [2001/31] | French: | Matériau d'emballage biodégradable | [2001/31] | Examination procedure | 01.08.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/10] | 09.09.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/10] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2003 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5393804 (GEORGE ERIC [US], et al) [X] 1-22 * column 1, line 10 - line 19 * * column 2, line 62 - column 4, line 36 * * column 6, line 9 - line 15 * * column 7, line 60 - column 8, line 29 * * column 9, line 1 - line 29 * * column 10, line 42 - column 12, line 67 *; | [Y]US5766529 (FRANKE HANS G [US], et al) [Y] 1-22 * example -; claim - *; | [Y]EP0965609 (NAT STARCH CHEM INVEST [US]) [Y] 1-22 * example -; claim - *; | [Y]EP0696611 (NOVAMONT SPA [IT]) [Y] 1-22 * example -; claim - *; | [Y]GB2252227 (NICHOLAS GEORGE, et al) [Y] 1-22 * page 2, paragraph 4 - page 3; claims 1,2 *; | [A]US5165950 (BOEHMER EDWARD W [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * example -; claim - * |