EP1182172 - Process of sintering a Silica gel body [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/09] | Process of sintering a gel body and preform for an optical fibre comprising the sintered body | ||
[2002/32] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.05.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.07.2003 [2003/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/09] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lum, Richard M. 30 Raven Road Colts Neck, New Jersey 07722 / US | 02 /
Mixon, David A. 324 Turkey Top Road Port Murray, New Jersey 07865 / US | 03 /
Monberg, Eric M. 459 Cherry Hill Road Princeton, New Jersey 08540 / US | 04 /
Trevor, Dennis J. 26 Hillside Drive Clinton, New Jersey 08809 / US | [2002/09] | Representative(s) | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex IG8 0TU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/09] | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 01301191.1 | 12.02.2001 | [2002/09] | Priority number, date | US20000222444 | 01.08.2000 Original published format: US 222444 | US20000708148 | 08.11.2000 Original published format: US 708148 | [2002/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1182172 | Date: | 27.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C03B19/12 | [2002/09] | CPC: |
C03B19/12 (EP,US);
C03B2201/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2002/46] |
Former [2002/09] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Sintern eines SiO2-Gelkörpers | [2002/32] | English: | Process of sintering a Silica gel body | [2002/32] | French: | Procédé de frittage d'un corps de gel de silice | [2002/32] |
Former [2002/09] | Verfahren zum Sintern eines Gelkörpers und Vorform für optische Fasern, welche den gesinterten Körper enthält | ||
Former [2002/09] | Process of sintering a gel body and preform for an optical fibre comprising the sintered body | ||
Former [2002/09] | Procédé de frittage d un corps et preforme pour fibres optiques comprenant le corps fritté | Examination procedure | 12.02.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 23.02.2001 | Examination requested [2002/09] | 28.03.2001 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 01.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/28] | 13.01.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2003/28] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2003 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH03232728 ; | [A]JPS63297228 ; | [A]EP0181040 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] 1,5* figure 1; claim 1 *; | [ET]EP1110918 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [E] 8 * paragraphs [0028] , [0029] * [T] 1,5; | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920109), vol. 16, no. 6, & JP03232728 A 19911016 (HITACHI CHEM CO LTD) [A] 1,5,8 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890404), vol. 13, no. 134, & JP63297228 A 19881205 (SEKO EPSON CORP) [A] 1,5 * abstract * | [A] - CLASEN R, "preparation of high-purity silica tubes by centrifugal casting of colloidal gels", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS SCIENCE LETTERS, CHAPMAN & HALL LTD, LONDON, GB, (198805), vol. 7, no. 5, ISSN 0261-8028, pages 477 - 478, XP002178983 [A] 1,5,8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01730696 |