EP1125770 - Pneumatic tyre [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Rubber Industries, Ltd. 6-9, Wakinohama-cho, 3-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/43] | For all designated states Sumitomo Rubber Industries Ltd. 6-9, Wakinohama-cho, 3-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | ||
Former [2001/34] | For all designated states Sumitomo Rubber Industries Ltd. 6-9, Wakinohama-cho, 3-chome, Chuo-ku# Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suzuki, Kazuya, c/o Sumitomo Rubber Industries Ltd 6-9, 3-chome, Wakinohama-cho, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | [2001/34] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/33] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/34] | Stewart, Charles Geoffrey Technical, Dunlop Tyres Ltd., Fort Dunlop Erdington, Birmingham B24 9QT / GB | Application number, filing date | 01301261.2 | 14.02.2001 | [2001/34] | Priority number, date | JP20000036908 | 15.02.2000 Original published format: JP 2000036908 | [2001/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1125770 | Date: | 22.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1125770 | Date: | 09.10.2002 | [2002/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1125770 | Date: | 20.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B60C13/02, B60C13/00 | [2001/34] | CPC: |
B60C13/002 (EP,US);
B60C13/02 (EP,US);
Y10T152/10819 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/27] |
Former [2001/34] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Luftreifen | [2001/34] | English: | Pneumatic tyre | [2001/34] | French: | Bandage pneumatique | [2001/34] | Examination procedure | 20.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/20] | 20.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 17.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH05294115 ; | [A]JPH0899508 ; | [A]JPH0382611 ; | [A]JPS621605 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940210), vol. 018, no. 083, Database accession no. (M - 1558), & JP05294115 A 19931109 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960830), vol. 1996, no. 08, & JP08099508 A 19960416 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910627), vol. 015, no. 253, Database accession no. (M - 1129), & JP03082611 A 19910408 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870529), vol. 011, no. 168, Database accession no. (M - 594), & JP62001605 A 19870107 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD:THE) [A] 1 * abstract * |