EP1126415 - Image drawing method and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.01.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.02.2014 [2014/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2013/31] |
Former [2013/24] | For all designated states Sony Computer Entertainment Incorporated 1-7-1 Konan, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2001/34] | For all designated states Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. 1-1, Akasaka 7-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0052 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hino, Akihiro, c/o Level-5 INC. Kyukan Daimyo Bldg. 6F, 2-6-28, Daimyo, Chuo-ku Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka-ken 810-0041 / JP | 02 /
Motomura, Kentaro, c/o Sony Computer Entertainment Inc., 1-1 Akasaka 7-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0052 / JP | [2001/34] | Representative(s) | Horner, David Richard D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/34] | Horner, David Richard D Young & Co, 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 01301366.9 | 16.02.2001 | [2001/34] | Priority number, date | JP20000039820 | 17.02.2000 Original published format: JP 2000039820 | JP20010015757 | 24.01.2001 Original published format: JP 2001015757 | [2001/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1126415 | Date: | 22.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1126415 | Date: | 24.09.2003 | [2003/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06T15/60 | [2001/34] | CPC: |
G06T15/60 (EP,US);
Y10S715/964 (US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/25] |
Former [2001/34] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Bildzeichnungverfahren und -gerät | [2001/34] | English: | Image drawing method and apparatus | [2001/34] | French: | Méthode et appareil de dessin | [2001/34] | Examination procedure | 11.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/16] | 13.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/06] | 27.09.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.04.2004 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2013 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - HUDSON S E, "ADDING SHADOWS TO A 3D CURSOR", ACM TRANSACTIONS ON GRAPHICS, ASSOCIATION FOR COMPUTING MACHINERY, NEW YORK, US, (19920401), vol. 11, no. 2, ISSN 0730-0301, pages 193 - 199, XP000287426 [X] 1-19 * page 193, paragraphs 1-3 * * page 195, line 1 - page 196, line 16 * * figures 3,4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/130881.370599 | [A] - FOLEY J D ET AL, "Computer Graphics", COMPUTER GRAPHICS. PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICE, READING, ADDISON WESLEY, US, pages 743 - 745, XP002204392 [A] 1-19 * page 749, line 1 - page 751, line 21; figures 16.29-16.30 * | [A] - BERGERON P, "A GENERAL VERSION OF CROW'S SHADOW VOLUMES", IEEE COMPUTER GRAPHICS AND APPLICATIONS, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (19860901), vol. 6, no. 9, ISSN 0272-1716, pages 17 - 28, XP000004795 [A] 1-19 * page 18, column 2, lines 6-18, paragraph 2 * * page 19, column 1, lines 1-32 * | [A] - JANSEN F W ET AL, "A SHADOW ALGORITHM FOR CSG", COMPUTERS AND GRAPHICS, PERGAMON PRESS LTD. OXFORD, GB, (1991), vol. 15, no. 2, ISSN 0097-8493, pages 237 - 247, XP000293297 [A] 1-19 * page 239, line 15 - line 28 * * page 239, column 1, line 55 - page 240, column 2, line 8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0097-8493(91)90077-U |