EP1134377 - Method and apparatus for accessing ability of lean NOx trap to store exhaust gas constitutent [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.02.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2005 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.04.2005 [2005/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ford Global Technologies, Inc. 600 Parklane Towers East Dearborn, MI 48126 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/38] | For all designated states Ford Global Technologies, Inc. 600 Parklane Towers East Dearborn, Michigan 48126 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bidner, David Karl 9618, Ingram Street Livonia, Michigan 48150 / US | 02 /
Surnilla, Gopichandra 5358, Midchester Court West Bloomfield, Michigan 48324 / US | [2001/38] | Representative(s) | Messulam, Alec Moses, et al Harrison IP Limited 3 Ebor House London Ebor Business Park Millfield Lane Nether Poppleton York YO26 6QY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/38] | Messulam, Alec Moses, et al A. Messulam & Co. Ltd., 43-45 High Road Bushey Heath, Bushey, Herts WD23 1EE / GB | Application number, filing date | 01301400.6 | 19.02.2001 | [2001/38] | Priority number, date | US20000528004 | 17.03.2000 Original published format: US 528004 | [2001/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1134377 | Date: | 19.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1134377 | Date: | 26.03.2003 | [2003/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F01N11/00, F02D41/02 | [2001/38] | CPC: |
F01N3/0842 (EP,US);
F01N11/00 (EP,US);
F01N13/009 (EP,US);
F01N13/0097 (EP,US);
F02D41/0275 (EP,US);
F02D41/146 (EP,US);
F02D41/1462 (EP,US);
F02D41/1463 (EP,US);
F01N2550/03 (EP,US);
F01N2560/026 (EP,US);
F02D2200/0811 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US);
Y02T10/40 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/51] |
Former [2001/38] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Bewertung der Abgaskomponentspeicherungsfähigkeit einer NOx-Falle für Magergemischverbrennung | [2001/38] | English: | Method and apparatus for accessing ability of lean NOx trap to store exhaust gas constitutent | [2001/38] | French: | Méthode et dispositif d'évaluation de la capacité d'un piège à NOx à stocker un constituant de gaz d'échappement pour combustion à mélange pauvre | [2001/38] | Examination procedure | 28.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/44] | 09.02.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE19823921 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-5,7-11,13-17 * column 2, line 8 - line 16 * * column 4, line 14 - line 57 * * claims 1,3,6 *; | [DA]US5953907 (KATO NOBUHIDE [JP], et al) [DA] 1-18 * column W *; | [A]EP0931923 (RENAULT [FR]) [A] 1-18 * column A * * claims 1,7 *; | [A]EP0915244 (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP [JP]) [A] * column A * * column 16, line 29 - column 17, line 42 * | [A] - CARTUS T ET AL, INTEGRATION DER NOX-ADSORBERTECHNOLOGIE IN ZUKUENFTIGE OTTO- UND DIESLMOTORKONZEPTE. INTEGRATION OF NOX-ADSORBER TECHNOLOGY IN FUTURE GASOLINE AND DIESEL ENGINE CONCEPTS, FORTSCHRITT-BERICHTE VDI. REIHE 12, VERKEHRSTECHNIK / FAHRZEUGTECHNIK, VDI VERLAG, DUESSELDORF, DE, NR. 348, PAGE(S) 343-365, ISSN 0178-9449, XP000764003 [A] 1-5,7-11,13-17 * page 354 - page 355 * | by applicant | US5473887 | US5953907 |