EP1130427 - Decoupling of transverse spatial modes in microstructure optical fibers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.12.2005 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/36] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ranka, Jinendra Kumar 175 Freeman Street Brookline, MA 02446 / US | 02 /
Windeler, Robert Scott 6 Willow Brook Lane Clinton Township, New Jersey 08801 / US | [2001/36] | Representative(s) | Schoppe, Fritz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Schoppe, Fritz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | ||
Former [2002/12] | Schoppe, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler, Postfach 71 08 67 81458 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/36] | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, Dr., et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 01301452.7 | 19.02.2001 | [2001/36] | Priority number, date | US20000186949P | 04.03.2000 Original published format: US 186949 P | US20010773702 | 01.02.2001 Original published format: US 773702 | [2001/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1130427 | Date: | 05.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1130427 | Date: | 12.01.2005 | [2005/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/16 | [2001/36] | CPC: |
G02B6/02366 (EP,US);
G02B6/02214 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2005/39] |
Former [2001/36] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Entkopplung von räumlich-transversalen Modi in mikrostrukturierten optischen Fasern | [2001/36] | English: | Decoupling of transverse spatial modes in microstructure optical fibers | [2001/36] | French: | Découplage des modes spatiaux transverses dans des fibres optiques à microstructures | [2001/36] | Examination procedure | 23.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/29] | 15.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.10.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | 05.12.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2005 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5802236 (DIGIOVANNI DAVID JOHN [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * column 8, line 56 - line 60 * * column 5, line 52 *; | [X]WO9900685 (SECR DEFENCE [GB], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract *; | [XP]EP1054273 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [XP] 1-15 * abstract *; | [X] - WINDELER R S ET AL, "SILICA-AIR MICROSTRUCTURED FIBERS: PROPERTIES AND APPLICATIONS", OFC/IOOC '99 OPTICAL FIBER COMMUNICATION CONFERENCE / INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON INTEGRATED OPTICS AND OPTICAL FIBER COMMUNICATION. SAN DIEGO, CA, FEB. 21 - 26, 1999, OPTICAL FIBER COMMUNICATION CONFERENCE / INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON INTEGRATED OP, (19990221), ISBN 0-7803-5430-3, pages FG1 - 1, XP000967104 [X] 1-15 * the whole document * | [X] - RANKA J K ET AL, "VISIBLE CONTINUUM GENERATION IN AIR-SILICA MICROSTRUCTURE OPTICAL FIBERS WITH ANOMALOUS DISPERSION AT 800 NM", OPTICS LETTERS, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, WASHINGTON, US, (20000101), vol. 25, no. 1, ISSN 0146-9592, pages 25 - 27, XP000928530 [X] 1-15 * page 26, column 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OL.25.000025 | [XP] - RANKA J K ET AL, "OPTICAL PROPERTIES OF HIGH-DELTA AIR-SILICA MICROSTRUCTURE OPTICAL FIBERS", OPTICS LETTERS, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, WASHINGTON, US, (20000620), vol. 25, no. 11, ISSN 0146-9592, pages 796 - 798, XP000951872 [XP] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OL.25.000796 |