EP1128644 - Communication terminal device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.12.2006 [2006/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/52] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2001/35] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hino, Ichiro c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Koshimura, Katsumi 11-16-503 Nakamura-Minami 1-chome Nerima-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2001/35] | Representative(s) | Nicholls, Michael John J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/35] | Nicholls, Michael John J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01301516.9 | 21.02.2001 | [2001/35] | Priority number, date | JP20000044509 | 22.02.2000 Original published format: JP 2000044509 | [2001/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1128644 | Date: | 29.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1128644 | Date: | 17.09.2003 | [2003/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1128644 | Date: | 28.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/725, H04M1/247 | [2001/35] | CPC: |
H04M1/03 (EP,US);
H04M1/0202 (EP,US);
H04M1/0258 (EP,US);
H04M1/6066 (EP,US);
H04M1/72412 (EP,US);
H04M1/021 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/24] |
Former [2001/35] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Kommunikationsendgerät | [2001/35] | English: | Communication terminal device | [2001/35] | French: | Dispositif terminal de communication | [2001/35] | Examination procedure | 24.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/18] | 19.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.01.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 07.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/49] | Request for further processing for: | 07.01.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 07.01.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.01.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0669746 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,4,6-8 * column 1, line 1 - column 7, line 45; figures 1-3 *; | [A]WO9839941 (ERICSSON GE MOBILE INC [US]) [A] 1-8 * page 2, line 9 - page 3, line 7 * * page 3, line 31 - page 7, line 33; figures 1-3 ** page 10, line 30 - page 11, line 16 *; | [XY]US5983073 (DITZIK RICHARD J [US]) [X] 1-4,6-8 * the whole document * [Y] 5; | [Y] - HAARTSEN J, "BLUETOOTH - THE UNIVERSAL RADIO INTERFACE FOR AD HOC, WIRELESS CONNECTIVITY", ON - ERICSSON REVIEW, ERICSSON. STOCKHOLM, SE, (1998), no. 3, ISSN 0014-0171, pages 110 - 117, XP000783249 [Y] 5 * the whole document * |