EP1237085 - Memory management method for configuring a computer data storage medium to include a virtual disk drive [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.10.2005 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wu, Yu-Te No. 42, Yung-Le 5th Street Chiayi City / TW | [2002/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/36] | Representative(s) | Moir, Michael Christopher, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/36] | Moir, Michael Christopher, et al Mathys & Squire 100 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 01301713.2 | 26.02.2001 | [2002/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1237085 | Date: | 04.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1237085 | Date: | 01.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/14 | [2002/36] | CPC: |
G06F11/1435 (EP);
G06F11/1417 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/36] | Title | German: | Speicherverwaltungsverfahren zur Konfiguration eines Computer-speichermediums mit einer virtuellen Platteneinheit | [2002/36] | English: | Memory management method for configuring a computer data storage medium to include a virtual disk drive | [2002/36] | French: | Méthode de gestion de mémoire pour configurer une mémoire d'ordinateur avec une unité de disque virtuelle | [2002/36] | Examination procedure | 20.02.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/36] | 02.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.12.2004 | BE | 01.12.2004 | CH | 01.12.2004 | FI | 01.12.2004 | IT | 01.12.2004 | LI | 01.12.2004 | NL | 01.12.2004 | TR | 01.12.2004 | CY | 26.02.2005 | LU | 26.02.2005 | IE | 28.02.2005 | MC | 28.02.2005 | DK | 01.03.2005 | GR | 01.03.2005 | SE | 01.03.2005 | ES | 12.03.2005 | PT | 01.05.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/36] | AT | 01.12.2004 | |
BE | 01.12.2004 | ||
CH | 01.12.2004 | ||
FI | 01.12.2004 | ||
IT | 01.12.2004 | ||
LI | 01.12.2004 | ||
NL | 01.12.2004 | ||
TR | 01.12.2004 | ||
CY | 26.02.2005 | ||
LU | 26.02.2005 | ||
IE | 28.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
DK | 01.03.2005 | ||
GR | 01.03.2005 | ||
SE | 01.03.2005 | ||
ES | 12.03.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 01.12.2004 | |
BE | 01.12.2004 | ||
CH | 01.12.2004 | ||
FI | 01.12.2004 | ||
LI | 01.12.2004 | ||
NL | 01.12.2004 | ||
TR | 01.12.2004 | ||
CY | 26.02.2005 | ||
LU | 26.02.2005 | ||
IE | 28.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
DK | 01.03.2005 | ||
GR | 01.03.2005 | ||
SE | 01.03.2005 | ||
ES | 12.03.2005 | ||
Former [2007/09] | AT | 01.12.2004 | |
BE | 01.12.2004 | ||
CH | 01.12.2004 | ||
FI | 01.12.2004 | ||
LI | 01.12.2004 | ||
NL | 01.12.2004 | ||
TR | 01.12.2004 | ||
LU | 26.02.2005 | ||
IE | 28.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
DK | 01.03.2005 | ||
GR | 01.03.2005 | ||
SE | 01.03.2005 | ||
ES | 12.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 01.12.2004 | |
BE | 01.12.2004 | ||
CH | 01.12.2004 | ||
FI | 01.12.2004 | ||
LI | 01.12.2004 | ||
NL | 01.12.2004 | ||
TR | 01.12.2004 | ||
IE | 28.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
DK | 01.03.2005 | ||
GR | 01.03.2005 | ||
ES | 12.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/23] | AT | 01.12.2004 | |
BE | 01.12.2004 | ||
CH | 01.12.2004 | ||
FI | 01.12.2004 | ||
LI | 01.12.2004 | ||
NL | 01.12.2004 | ||
IE | 28.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
DK | 01.03.2005 | ||
GR | 01.03.2005 | ||
ES | 12.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 01.12.2004 | |
BE | 01.12.2004 | ||
CH | 01.12.2004 | ||
FI | 01.12.2004 | ||
LI | 01.12.2004 | ||
NL | 01.12.2004 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
DK | 01.03.2005 | ||
GR | 01.03.2005 | ||
ES | 12.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 01.12.2004 | |
BE | 01.12.2004 | ||
CH | 01.12.2004 | ||
FI | 01.12.2004 | ||
LI | 01.12.2004 | ||
DK | 01.03.2005 | ||
GR | 01.03.2005 | ||
ES | 12.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 01.12.2004 | |
BE | 01.12.2004 | ||
CH | 01.12.2004 | ||
FI | 01.12.2004 | ||
LI | 01.12.2004 | ||
GR | 01.03.2005 | ||
ES | 12.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/36] | AT | 01.12.2004 | |
CH | 01.12.2004 | ||
FI | 01.12.2004 | ||
LI | 01.12.2004 | ||
GR | 01.03.2005 | ||
ES | 12.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/27] | CH | 01.12.2004 | |
FI | 01.12.2004 | ||
LI | 01.12.2004 | ||
GR | 01.03.2005 | ||
ES | 12.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | CH | 01.12.2004 | |
FI | 01.12.2004 | ||
LI | 01.12.2004 | ||
GR | 01.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/25] | CH | 01.12.2004 | |
FI | 01.12.2004 | ||
LI | 01.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 01.12.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0319147 (IBM [US]) [A] 1-27 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0402683 (DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORP [US]) [A] 1-27 * the whole document *; | [A]US5089958 (HORTON JAMES A [US], et al) [A] 1-27 * the whole document *; | [A]US5247660 (ASHCRAFT WILLIAM J [US], et al) [A] 1-27* the whole document *; | [A]US5325519 (LONG DONALD W [US], et al) [A] 1-27 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2332962 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-27 * the whole document *; | [A]US5987565 (GAVASKAR VIVEK N [US]) [A] 1-27 * the whole document *; | [XA]US6016536 (WU YE-TE [TW], et al) [X] 1,16 * the whole document * [A] 2-15,17-27; | [A]WO0101251 (MICROSOFT CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-27 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0106366 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [A] 1-27 * the whole document * |