EP1146671 - High capacity ultra-long haul dispersion and nonlinearity managed lightwave communication systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.09.2005 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 05.11.2008 [2008/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qtera Corporation 6100 Broken Sound Parkway N.W. Boca Raton Florida 33487 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/42] | For all designated states Qtera Corporation 6100 Broken Sound Parkway N.W. Boca Raton, Florida 33487 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cao, Xiang-Dong 19620 Star Island Drive Boca Raton, Florida 33487 / US | [2001/42] | Representative(s) | Ertl, Nicholas Justin, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/42] | Ertl, Nicholas Justin, et al Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 01301954.2 | 05.03.2001 | [2001/42] | Priority number, date | US20000518448 | 03.03.2000 Original published format: US 518448 | [2001/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1146671 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1146671 | Date: | 11.06.2003 | [2003/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1146671 | Date: | 10.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/17, H04B10/18, H04J14/02 | [2003/23] | CPC: |
H04B10/2916 (EP,US);
H04B10/2525 (EP,US);
H04B2210/258 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/42] | H04B10/17 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/10] |
Former [2001/42] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Lichtwellenübertragungssysteme hoher Kapazität für Fernübertragung mit kontrollierter Dispersion und Nichtlinearitäten | [2001/42] | English: | High capacity ultra-long haul dispersion and nonlinearity managed lightwave communication systems | [2001/42] | French: | Système optique de communication à grande distance et haute capacité avec dispersion et non-linearités controlées | [2001/42] | Examination procedure | 19.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/03] | 11.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 05.03.2005 | FR | 31.03.2005 | [2008/45] |
Former [2006/13] | GB | 05.03.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0554714 (CORNING INC [US]) [A] 1-19 * abstract *; | [A]US5504609 (ALEXANDER STEPHEN B [US], et al) [A] 1-19* abstract *; | [A]EP0862284 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1-19 * abstract *; | [DA] - KAMINOW I. P. ET AL, "OPTICAL FIBER TELECOMMUNICATIONS IIIA", ACADEMIC PRESS, (1997), pages 373 - 461, XP009009245 [DA] 1-19 * page 438 - page 439; figure 12.45 * | [A] - HENMI N ET AL, "PRECHIRP TECHNIQUE AS A LINEAR DISPERSION COMPENSATION FOR ULTRAHIGH-SPEED LONG-SPAN INTENSITY MODULATION DIRECTED DETECTION OPTICAL COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS", JOURNAL OF LIGHTWAVE TECHNOLOGY, IEEE. NEW YORK, US, (19941001), vol. 12, no. 10, ISSN 0733-8724, pages 1706 - 1719, XP000469524 [A] 1-19 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/50.337482 |