EP1132068 - Absorbent article [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.02.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2007 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.03.2007 [2007/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Unicharm Corporation 182 Shimobun Kinsei-cho Shikokuchuo-shi Ehime 799-0111 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/24] | For all designated states Uni-Charm Corporation 182 Shimobun, Kinsei-cho Shikokuchuo-shi, Ehime-ken / JP | ||
Former [2001/37] | For all designated states UNI-CHARM CORPORATION 182, Shimobun Kinsei-machi Kawanoe-shi Ehime-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoshimasa, Wataru, c/o Technical Center 1531-7 Takasuka, Wadahama, Toyohama-cho Mitoyo-gun, Kagawa-ken 769-1602 / JP | [2001/37] | Representative(s) | Parry, Christopher Stephen Saunders & Dolleymore 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford, Herts. WD18 0JU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/37] | Parry, Christopher Stephen Saunders & Dolleymore, 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford, Herts. WD18 0JU / GB | Application number, filing date | 01301996.3 | 05.03.2001 | [2001/37] | Priority number, date | JP20000062141 | 07.03.2000 Original published format: JP 2000062141 | [2001/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1132068 | Date: | 12.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1132068 | Date: | 28.11.2001 | [2001/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/475, A61F13/472 | [2001/37] | CPC: |
A61F13/472 (EP,US);
A61F13/476 (KR);
A61F13/47263 (EP,US);
A61F13/4752 (EP,US);
A61F13/4753 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [2002/33] |
Former [2001/37] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Absorbierender Artikel | [2001/37] | English: | Absorbent article | [2001/37] | French: | Article absorbant | [2001/37] | Examination procedure | 13.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/29] | 09.02.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5181563 (AMARAL EVERSON [BR]) [A] 5 * figures 1A-6 *; | [X]WO9301786 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1,2,4,6,8 * page 10, line 27 - page 11, line 17 * * page 48, line 28 - page 50, line 26 * * figures 1,23A-23C *; | [X]US5584829 (LAVASH BRUCE W [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * column 9, line 32 - column 10, line 24 * * column 18, line 59 - column 20, line 62 * * column 25, line 33 - column 26, line 14 * * column 27, line 52 - column 28, line 66 * * figures 1-26 *; | [X]WO9739710 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [X] 1-3,6,7,9 * page 26, line 6 - page 29, line 26; figures 1-15 *; | [A]US5730738 (MCFALL RONALD RAY [US], et al) [A] 5 * figures 1-16 *; | [X]WO9817217 (KAO CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,6,8-11 * page 17, line 18 - page 19, line 9 * * figures 1-4,8 *; | [A]WO9831320 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [A] 7* figures 1-11 *; | [X]EP0908162 (UNI CHARM CORP [JP]) [X] 1-3,6,8,9 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0017]; figures 1-5 *; | [X]US5954705 (SAWAKI NORIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,8 * figures 1-4 * * column 11, line 8 - column 12, line 8 *; | [PX]EP0985396 (UNI CHARM CORP [JP]) [PX] 1-4,6,8-10 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0026] * * figures 1-5 *; | [E]EP1132066 (UNI CHARM CORP [JP]) [E] 1-3,6,8-11 * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0064]; figures 1-9 * |