EP1132069 - ABSORBENT ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/37] | Absorbent article | ||
[2009/35] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 10.08.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2012 | Opposition rejected | published on 12.09.2012 [2012/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Unicharm Corporation 182 Shimobun Kinsei-cho Shikokuchuo-shi Ehime 799-0111 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/01] | For all designated states UNI-CHARM CORPORATION 182 Shimobun, Kinsei-cho Shikokuchuo-shi Ehime-ken / JP | ||
Former [2004/24] | For all designated states Uni-Charm Corporation 182 Shimobun, Kinsei-cho Shikokuchuo-shi, Ehime-ken / JP | ||
Former [2001/37] | For all designated states UNI-CHARM CORPORATION 182 Shimobun, Kinsei-cho Kawanoe-shi Ehime-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mizutani, Satoshi, c/o Technical Center Uni-Charm Corporation 1531-7, Wadahama, Toyohama-cho Kanonji-shi Kagawa-ken 769-1602, Japan / JP | 02 /
Suekane, Makoto, c/o Technical Center Uni-Charm Corporation 1531-7, Wadahama, Toyohama-cho Kanonji-shi, Kagawa-ken 769-1602, Japan / JP | 03 /
Nishitani, Kazuya, c/o Technical Center Uni-Charm Corporation 1531-7, Wadahama, Toyohama-cho Kanonji-shi, Kagawa-ken 769-1602, Japan / JP | [2010/01] |
Former [2009/51] | 01 /
Mizutani, Satoshi, c/o Technical Center Uni-Charm Corporation 1531-7, Wadahama, Toyohama-cho, Kanonji-shi Kagawa 769-1602, Japan Mitoyo-gun, Kagawa-ken 769-1602 / JP | ||
02 /
Suekane, Makoto, c/o Technical Center Uni-Charm Corporation 1531-7, Wadahama, Toyohama-cho, Kanonji-shi, Kagawa 769-1602, Japan Mitoyo-gun, Kagawa-ken 769-1602 / JP | |||
03 /
Nishitani, Kazuya, c/o Technical Center Uni-Charm Corporation 1531-7, Wadahama, Toyohama-cho, Kanonji-shi, Kagawa 769-1602, Japan Mitoyo-gun, Kagawa-ken 769-1602 / JP | |||
Former [2001/37] | 01 /
Mizutani, Satoshi, c/o Technical Center 1531-7 Takasuka, Wadahama, Toyohama-cho Mitoyo-gun, Kagawa-ken 769-1602 / JP | ||
02 /
Suekane, Makoto, c/o Technical Center 1531-7 Takasuka, Wadahama, Toyohama-cho Mitoyo-gun, Kagawa-ken 769-1602 / JP | |||
03 /
Nishitani, Kazuya, c/o Technical Center 1531-7 Takasuka, Wadahama, Toyohama-cho Mitoyo-gun, Kagawa-ken 769-1602 / JP | Representative(s) | Eke, Philippa Dianne, et al Saunders & Dolleymore LLP 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford Hertfordshire WD18 0JU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/41] | Eke, Philippa Dianne, et al Saunders & Dolleymore 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford Hertfordshire WD18 0JU / GB | ||
Former [2001/37] | Parry, Christopher Stephen Saunders & Dolleymore, 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford, Herts. WD18 0JU / GB | Application number, filing date | 01302019.3 | 06.03.2001 | [2001/37] | Priority number, date | JP20000060246 | 06.03.2000 Original published format: JP 2000060246 | [2001/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1132069 | Date: | 12.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1132069 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | [2001/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1132069 | Date: | 06.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/475, A61F13/494 | [2001/37] | CPC: |
A61F13/4753 (EP,US);
A61F13/475 (KR);
A61F13/4756 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [2002/31] |
Former [2001/37] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | ABSORBIERENDER ARTIKEL | [2009/35] | English: | ABSORBENT ARTICLE | [2009/35] | French: | ARTICLE ABSORBANT | [2009/35] |
Former [2001/37] | Absorbierender Artikel | ||
Former [2001/37] | Absorbent article | ||
Former [2001/37] | Article absorbant | Examination procedure | 29.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/27] | 30.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 04.11.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
06.10.2010
20.10.2010
ADMISSIBLE THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US Opponent's representative Briatore, Andrea Procter & Gamble Italia S.p.A. Italian Research Center Via Aterno 128-130 66020 Sambuceto di San Giovanni Teatino (Chieti) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2011/47] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.10.2010
20.10.2010
ADMISSIBLE THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US Opponent's representative Briatore, Andrea Procter & Gamble Italia S.p.A. Via Aterno, 128-130 66020 Sambuceto di S. Giovanni Teatino (Chieti) / IT | ||
Former [2010/45] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.10.2010
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US Opponent's representative Veronese, Pancrazio Procter & Gamble Italia S.p.A. Centro Tecnico di Sambuceto Via Aterno 128/130 Sambuceto 66020 San Giovanni Teatino (CH) / IT | 11.11.2010 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 10.05.2011 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 14.03.2012 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2012/37] | 14.03.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.04.2012 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 27.04.2012 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5167653 (IGAUE TAKAMITSU [JP], et al) [A] 2 * figures 3-8 *; | [X]US5312386 (CORREA MAURO F C [BR], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7 * column 8, line 42 - column 9, line 20 * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]WO9511649 (KROYER K K K [FR]) [A] 9 * page 2, line 20 - page 3, line 13 * * page 6, line 11 - page 7, line 22 ** figures 3-5 *; | [A]US5456971 (FAHMY TAREK [DE]) [A] 8 * column 3, line 6 - column 5, line 11 * * figures 3-7 *; | [X]WO9709017 (MCNEIL PPC INC [US]) [X] 1,3,6-9 * page 28, line 27 - page 31, line 30 * * figures 1-9 *; | [A]WO9709016 (MCNEIL PPC INC [US]) [A] 4 * figure 16 *; | [X]GB2319730 (KAO CORP [JP]) [X] 1,3,5-7 * page 7, line 21 - page 27, line 6 * * figures 1-11 *; | [A]US5807363 (HAMAJIMA MITSUGU [JP], et al) [A] 1 * figures 1-10 *; | [X]EP0876810 (KAO CORP [JP]) [X] 1,5-9 * column 3, line 6 - column 4, line 50 * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP0904759 (UNI CHARM CORP [JP]) [A] 2 * figure 2 *; | [X]EP0962208 (UNI CHARM CORP [JP]) [X] 1,5,7 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0022] * * figures 1-5 * |