EP1239444 - Liquid crystal display device and method for driving the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.02.2006 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.04.2006 [2006/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/37] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Adachi, Katsumi 7-8-10, Mamigaoka Kashiba-shi, Nara 639-0223 / JP | 02 /
Yamakura, Makoto 2-2-2-619, Minamiterakatakitadori Moriguchi-shi, Osaka 570-0046 / JP | [2002/37] | Representative(s) | Dempster, Benjamin John Naftel, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/37] | Dempster, Benjamin John Naftel, et al Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 01302046.6 | 06.03.2001 | [2002/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1239444 | Date: | 11.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/36 | [2002/37] | CPC: |
G09G3/3655 (EP,US);
G09G2300/0876 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0219 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0247 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0606 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0626 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/37] | Title | German: | Flüssigkristallanzeigevorrichtung und Ansteuerungsverfahren dafür | [2002/37] | English: | Liquid crystal display device and method for driving the same | [2002/37] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage à cristaux liquides et son procédé de commande | [2002/37] | Examination procedure | 24.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/13] | 01.10.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/15] | 07.11.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2005 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0622655 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,9-15,17-21 * column 21, line 21 - column 22, line 42; figures 12,19 * [Y] 4,5,16,22,23; | [Y]US5706023 (NAGATA SEIICHI [JP], et al) [Y] 4,5,22,23 * column 3, line 55 - column 8, line 17 *; | [YA]EP0241562 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [Y] 16 * page 14, line 13 - page 16, line 23; figure 5 * [A] 6-8; | [A]US5686932 (TOMITA SATORU [JP]) [A] 10,18 * column 6, line 33 - column 13, line 63; figure 10 * |