EP1132053 - Polymer filled bone plate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.12.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zimmer Technology, Inc. 150 North Wacker Drive, Suite 1200 Chicago Illinois 60606 / US | [2006/06] |
Former [2004/19] | For all designated states Zimmer Technology, Inc. 150 North Wacker Drive, Suite 1200 Chicago, Illinois 60606 / US | ||
Former [2001/37] | For all designated states BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY 345 Park Avenue New York, N.Y. 10154-0037 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stalcup, Gergory C. 3385 N. 150 W. Columbia City, IN 46725 / US | 02 /
Lozier, Antony J. 1020 Wellington Drive Warsaw, IN 46582 / US | [2001/37] | Representative(s) | Mays, Julie, et al Barker Brettell LLP First Floor, Atrium Court 15-17 Jockey's Fields London WC1R 4BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/06] | Mays, Julie, et al Barker Brettell, Patent Attorneys, 10-12 Priests Bridge London SW15 5JE / GB | ||
Former [2001/37] | Colmer, Stephen Gary, et al Mathys & Squire 100 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 01302068.0 | 07.03.2001 | [2001/37] | Priority number, date | US20000520262 | 07.03.2000 Original published format: US 520262 | [2001/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1132053 | Date: | 12.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1132053 | Date: | 08.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/80 | [2001/37] | CPC: |
A61B17/80 (EP,US);
A61B17/7059 (EP,US);
A61B17/8061 (EP,US);
A61B17/8085 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/23] |
Former [2001/37] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Polymergefüllte Knochenplatte | [2001/37] | English: | Polymer filled bone plate | [2001/37] | French: | Plaque pour ostéosynthèse remplie de polymère | [2001/37] | Examination procedure | 08.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/20] | 23.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.11.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.02.2006 | BE | 08.02.2006 | CY | 08.02.2006 | FI | 08.02.2006 | NL | 08.02.2006 | TR | 08.02.2006 | IE | 07.03.2006 | LU | 07.03.2006 | MC | 31.03.2006 | DK | 08.05.2006 | SE | 08.05.2006 | GR | 09.05.2006 | PT | 10.07.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 08.02.2006 | |
BE | 08.02.2006 | ||
FI | 08.02.2006 | ||
NL | 08.02.2006 | ||
TR | 08.02.2006 | ||
IE | 07.03.2006 | ||
LU | 07.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
DK | 08.05.2006 | ||
SE | 08.05.2006 | ||
GR | 09.05.2006 | ||
PT | 10.07.2006 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 08.02.2006 | |
BE | 08.02.2006 | ||
FI | 08.02.2006 | ||
NL | 08.02.2006 | ||
IE | 07.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
DK | 08.05.2006 | ||
SE | 08.05.2006 | ||
GR | 09.05.2006 | ||
PT | 10.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | AT | 08.02.2006 | |
BE | 08.02.2006 | ||
FI | 08.02.2006 | ||
NL | 08.02.2006 | ||
IE | 07.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
DK | 08.05.2006 | ||
SE | 08.05.2006 | ||
PT | 10.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/36] | AT | 08.02.2006 | |
BE | 08.02.2006 | ||
FI | 08.02.2006 | ||
IT | 08.02.2006 | ||
NL | 08.02.2006 | ||
IE | 07.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
DK | 08.05.2006 | ||
SE | 08.05.2006 | ||
PT | 10.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 08.02.2006 | |
BE | 08.02.2006 | ||
FI | 08.02.2006 | ||
NL | 08.02.2006 | ||
IE | 07.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
DK | 08.05.2006 | ||
SE | 08.05.2006 | ||
PT | 10.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | AT | 08.02.2006 | |
FI | 08.02.2006 | ||
NL | 08.02.2006 | ||
IE | 07.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
DK | 08.05.2006 | ||
SE | 08.05.2006 | ||
PT | 10.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | AT | 08.02.2006 | |
FI | 08.02.2006 | ||
NL | 08.02.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
DK | 08.05.2006 | ||
SE | 08.05.2006 | ||
PT | 10.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 08.02.2006 | |
FI | 08.02.2006 | ||
NL | 08.02.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
DK | 08.05.2006 | ||
SE | 08.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | AT | 08.02.2006 | |
FI | 08.02.2006 | ||
NL | 08.02.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
SE | 08.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/43] | AT | 08.02.2006 | |
FI | 08.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 08.02.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB952842 (UNISEARCH LTD) [Y] 1-3,7-14,16 * abstract * * page 1, column L, lines 10-26 *; | [A]US4403607 (WOO SAVIO L-Y [US], et al) [A] 14* page DW, column 6, line 60 - column 7, line 8 *; | [A]WO8909031 (SHEFFIELD CITY COUNCIL [GB]) [A] 1,3,7-14,16 * abstract * * page 3, paragraph 1 *; | [A]US4893618 (HERZBERG WOLFGANG [DE]) [A] 1,11,12,19,21 * abstract * * column 1, lines 1-13 *; | [A]US5013315 (BARROWS THOMAS H [US]) [A] 13 * abstract *; | [Y]US5658286 (SAVA GARARD A [US]) [Y] 1-3,7-14,16 * abstract * * column 4, lines 21-29 * |