EP1132812 - Method of detecting dissolve/fade in mpeg-compressed video environment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.2007 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 20, Yoido-Dong Yongdungpo-Ku Seoul / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/17] | For all designated states LG ELECTRONICS INC. 20, Yoido-Dong, Yongdungpo-Ku Seoul / KR | ||
Former [2001/37] | For all designated states LG ELECTRONICS INC. 20, Yoido-Dong, Yongdungpo-Ku Seoul / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jun, Sung Bae 804, Siheung 4-Dong, Keumchun-Ku Seoul / KR | 02 /
Yoon, Kyoung Ro Yeoksam MBC Apt. 3-1205, Dogok 1-Dong Kangnam-Ku, Seoul / KR | [2001/37] | Representative(s) | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/37] | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 01302080.5 | 07.03.2001 | [2001/37] | Priority number, date | KR20000011334 | 07.03.2000 Original published format: KR 2000011334 | [2001/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1132812 | Date: | 12.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1132812 | Date: | 26.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G06F7/20, H04N5/14, G06F17/30 | [2001/37] | CPC: |
H04N5/147 (EP,US);
G11B20/10 (KR);
G06V20/49 (EP,US);
H04N19/142 (EP,US);
H04N19/179 (EP,US);
H04N19/87 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2002/23] |
Former [2001/37] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren um Überblendung in einer MPEG-Umgebung zu detektieren | [2001/37] | English: | Method of detecting dissolve/fade in mpeg-compressed video environment | [2001/37] | French: | Procédé de détection de fondu-enchaîné dans un environnement MPEG | [2001/37] | Examination procedure | 29.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/15] | 25.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2008/04] |
Former [2007/36] | IT | 26.04.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0780844 (SIEMENS CORP RES INC [US]) [X] 1-19 * page 2, line 1 - page 2, line 54 * * page 4, line 46 - page 6, line 38 * * page 10, line 36 - page 12, line 52 *; | [A]EP0938054 (SIEMENS CORP RES INC [US]) [A] 1-19 * column 4, line 2 - column 4, line 14 * * column 6, line 36 - column 8, line 51 *; | [A]EP0675495 (SIEMENS CORP RES INC [US]) [A] 1-19 * page 10, line 21 - page 10, line 40 *; | [X] - MENG J ET AL, "SCENE CHANGE DETECTION IN A MPEG COMPRESSED VIDEO SEQUENCE", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE, (19950207), pages 14 - 25, XP000670965 [X] 1-19 * page 16, paragraph 4.1 * * page 18, paragraph 4.2 * * page 19, paragraph 5 * * page 20, paragraph 5.2 - page 21, paragraph 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.206359 | [X] - YU H H, "HIERARCHICAL MULTIRESOLUTION VIDEO SHOT TRANSITION DETECTION SCHEME", COMPUTER VISION AND IMAGE UNDERSTANDING,US,ACADEMIC PRESS, (199907), vol. 75, no. 1/02, ISSN 1077-3142, pages 196 - 213, XP000865326 [X] 1-19 * page 196, column R, line 8 - page 197, column L, line L; figure 1 * * page 197, column R, line 15 - page 199, column L, line 36 * * page 202, column R, line 23 - page 204, column R, line 10; figures 5-7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/cviu.1999.0773 | [A] - ALATTAR A M, "DETECTING AND COMPRESSING DISSOLVE REGIONS IN VIDEO SEQUENCES WITH A DVI MULTIMEDIA IMAGE COMPRESSION ALGORITHM", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS. (ISCS),US,NEW YORK, IEEE, (19930503), vol. -, ISBN 0-7803-1281-3, pages 13 - 16, XP000409923 [A] 1-19 * page 14, column L, line 4 - page 15, column R, line 12 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISCAS.1993.393643 | [A] - ALATTAR A M, "WIPE SCENE CHANGE DETECTOR FOR USE WITH VIDEO COMPRESSION ALGORITHMS AND MPEG-7", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS,IEEE INC. NEW YORK,US, (19980201), vol. 44, no. 1, ISSN 0098-3063, pages 43 - 51, XP000779249 [A] 1-19 * page 43, column R, line 18 - page 44, column L, line 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/30.663729 | [A] - FENG JIAN ET AL, "Scene change detection algorithm for MPEG video sequence", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON IMAGE PROCESSING (ICIP),US,NEW YORK, IEEE, (19960916), ISBN 0-7803-3259-8, pages 821 - 824, XP002132912 [A] 1-19 * page 822, column L, line 38 - page 822, column L, line 54 * * page 823, column L, paragraph 3.4 - page 823, column R, line L * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICIP.1996.561031 | [A] - LIU H -C H ET AL, "SCENE DECOMPOSITION OF MPEG COMPRESSED VIDEO", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE, (19950207), pages 26 - 37, XP000671108 [A] 1-19 * page 26, paragraph 1 * * page 29, line 3 - page 30, paragraph 3 * * page 32, paragraph 4 - page 33, line L * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.206370 |