EP1152378 - Encrypting keypad module [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.11.2005 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NCR INTERNATIONAL INC. 1700 South Patterson Boulevard Dayton Ohio 45479 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/45] | For all designated states NCR INTERNATIONAL INC. 1700 South Patterson Boulevard Dayton, Ohio 45479 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Whytock, Alexander William 23 Queen Street Coupar Angus, Perthshire PH13 9DE / GB | [2001/45] | Representative(s) | Williamson, Brian, et al NCR Limited International Patent Department 206 Marylebone Road London NW1 6LY / GB | [2008/32] |
Former [2001/45] | Williamson, Brian, et al International IP Department, NCR Limited, 206 Marylebone Road London NW1 6LY / GB | Application number, filing date | 01302228.0 | 12.03.2001 | [2001/45] | Priority number, date | GB20000010265 | 28.04.2000 Original published format: GB 0010265 | [2001/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1152378 | Date: | 07.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1152378 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | [2003/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G07F7/10 | [2001/45] | CPC: |
G07F7/1008 (EP);
G06Q20/341 (EP);
G06Q20/4097 (EP);
G07F19/20 (EP);
G07F19/205 (EP);
G07F7/10 (EP);
G07F7/1016 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB [2003/49] |
Former [2001/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verschlüsselungsmodul für Tastatur | [2001/45] | English: | Encrypting keypad module | [2001/45] | French: | Module d'encryptage pour clavier | [2001/45] | Examination procedure | 12.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/46] | 14.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/01] | 02.08.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5825875 (UGON MICHEL [FR]) [X] 1,3,5-8 * column 1, line 47 - line 65 * * column 4, line 37 - column 6, line 48; figure 1 * [A] 2,4; | [XA]US5815577 (CLARK DERECK D [US]) [X] 1,6,8 * column 4, line 23 - column 6, line 54 * * column 8, line 8 - column 9, line 22; figures 2,3,11 * [A] 2-5,7; | [XA]US4731842 (SMITH PETER R [GB]) [X] 1,4,6,8 * column 1, line 44 - column 2, line 26 * * column 2, line 61 - column 8, line 43; figure 1 * [A] 2,3,5,7; | [A]US4438824 (MUELLER-SCHLOER CHRISTIAN [US]) [A] 1,6,8 * column 5, line 31 - column 10, line 68; figures 1-6 * |