EP1134128 - Arrangement for permitting vehicle foot pedal retraction, and vehicle incorporating same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.05.2006 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KSR Automotive Limited Moat Road Normanby Enterprise Park Scunthorpe DN15 9GA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/31] | For all designated states KSR Automotive Limited Moat Road Normanby Enterprise Park Scunthorpe DN15 9GA / GB | ||
Former [2001/38] | For all designated states BCK Technology Limited Moats Road, Lysaghts Way, Lysaghts Enterprise Park Scunthorpe, North Lincolnshire DN15 1ZZ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thistleton, John Stuart Thistles End, Lowthorpe Southrey, Nr Lincoln LN3 5TD / GB | [2001/38] | Representative(s) | Long, Edward Anthony, et al Hulse & Co St. James House 2nd Floor Vicar Lane Sheffield S1 2EX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/38] | Long, Edward Anthony, et al Hulse & Co, St. James House, 8th Floor, Vicar Lane Sheffield S1 2EX / GB | Application number, filing date | 01302404.7 | 15.03.2001 | [2001/38] | Priority number, date | GB20000006365 | 17.03.2000 Original published format: GB 0006365 | [2001/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1134128 | Date: | 19.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1134128 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | [2004/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1134128 | Date: | 20.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/09, G05G1/14, B60T7/06 | [2004/01] | CPC: |
G05G1/323 (EP,US);
B60R21/09 (EP,US);
B60T7/065 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20528 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/38] | B60R21/09, G05G1/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/38] | Title | German: | Anordnung die das Zurückziehen eines Kraftfahrzeug- Fusspedals gestattet und Kraftfahrzeug mit einer derartigen Anordnung | [2001/38] | English: | Arrangement for permitting vehicle foot pedal retraction, and vehicle incorporating same | [2001/38] | French: | Montage permettant la rétraction d'une pédale à pied de véhicule, et véhicule incorporant ce montage | [2001/38] | Examination procedure | 30.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/36] | 10.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.05.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 18.05.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.04.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.07.2005 | CH | 20.07.2005 | CY | 20.07.2005 | FI | 20.07.2005 | LI | 20.07.2005 | NL | 20.07.2005 | TR | 20.07.2005 | DK | 20.10.2005 | GR | 20.10.2005 | SE | 20.10.2005 | PT | 21.12.2005 | IE | 15.03.2006 | LU | 31.03.2006 | MC | 31.03.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2007/12] | AT | 20.07.2005 | |
CH | 20.07.2005 | ||
FI | 20.07.2005 | ||
LI | 20.07.2005 | ||
NL | 20.07.2005 | ||
TR | 20.07.2005 | ||
DK | 20.10.2005 | ||
GR | 20.10.2005 | ||
SE | 20.10.2005 | ||
PT | 21.12.2005 | ||
IE | 15.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | AT | 20.07.2005 | |
CH | 20.07.2005 | ||
FI | 20.07.2005 | ||
LI | 20.07.2005 | ||
NL | 20.07.2005 | ||
TR | 20.07.2005 | ||
DK | 20.10.2005 | ||
GR | 20.10.2005 | ||
SE | 20.10.2005 | ||
PT | 21.12.2005 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 20.07.2005 | |
CH | 20.07.2005 | ||
FI | 20.07.2005 | ||
LI | 20.07.2005 | ||
NL | 20.07.2005 | ||
TR | 20.07.2005 | ||
DK | 20.10.2005 | ||
GR | 20.10.2005 | ||
SE | 20.10.2005 | ||
PT | 21.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/46] | AT | 20.07.2005 | |
CH | 20.07.2005 | ||
FI | 20.07.2005 | ||
LI | 20.07.2005 | ||
NL | 20.07.2005 | ||
DK | 20.10.2005 | ||
GR | 20.10.2005 | ||
SE | 20.10.2005 | ||
PT | 21.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/26] | AT | 20.07.2005 | |
CH | 20.07.2005 | ||
FI | 20.07.2005 | ||
LI | 20.07.2005 | ||
NL | 20.07.2005 | ||
DK | 20.10.2005 | ||
GR | 20.10.2005 | ||
SE | 20.10.2005 | ||
PT | 21.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 20.07.2005 | |
CH | 20.07.2005 | ||
FI | 20.07.2005 | ||
LI | 20.07.2005 | ||
NL | 20.07.2005 | ||
GR | 20.10.2005 | ||
SE | 20.10.2005 | ||
PT | 21.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 20.07.2005 | |
FI | 20.07.2005 | ||
SE | 20.10.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9730876 (ITT MFG ENTERPRISES INC [US], et al) [A] 1 * page 3 - page 4; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0827885 (SIV SPA [IT]) [A] 1* column 2, line 31 - column 3, line 47; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0904990 (ITT MFG ENTERPRISES INC [US]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0009] - [0013]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0947392 (FORD GLOBAL TECH INC [US]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0010] - [0015]; figures 1,2 * | by applicant | EP0085079 | GB2279625 | EP0757946 | WO9706036 | EP0788931 | EP0810124 | EP0827885 | EP0836968 |