EP1136451 - Glass melting process and furnace therefor with oxy-fuel combustion over melting zone and air-fuel combustion over fining zone [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 05.06.2009 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2009 | Revocation of patent | published on 08.07.2009 [2009/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AIR PRODUCTS AND CHEMICALS, INC. 7201 Hamilton Boulevard Allentown, PA 18195-1501 / US | [2001/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hoke, Bryan Clair 234 Longwood Drive Bethlehem, PA 18020 / US | 02 /
Lievre, Kevin Alan 1115 Greenleaf Circle Allentown, PA 18103 / US | 03 /
Slavejkov, Aleksandar Georgi 216 Murray Drive Allentown, PA 18104 / US | 04 /
Inskip, Julian Leonard 12 Waterside Cottages, Cholmondeley Road, Wrenbury Nantwich, Cheshire CW5 8GZ / GB | 05 /
Marchiando, Robert Dean 1176 Sharonbrook Drive Twinsburg, OH 44087 / US | 06 /
Eng, Robert Michael 17595 Harvard, C1008 CA 92614 / US | [2007/32] |
Former [2003/42] | 01 /
Hoke, Bryan Clair 234 Longwood Drive Bethlehem, PA 18020 / US | ||
02 /
Lievre, Kevin Alan 1115 Greenleaf Circle Allentown, PA 18103 / US | |||
03 /
Slavejkov, Aleksandar Georgi 216 Murray Drive Allentown, PA 18104 / US | |||
04 /
Inskip, Julian Leonard 12 Waterside Cottages, Cholmondeley Road, Wrenbury Nantwich, Cheshire CW5 8GZ / GB | |||
05 /
Marchiando, Robert Dean 1176 Sharonbrook Drive Twinsburg, OH 44087 / US | |||
06 /
Eng, Robert Michael 17595 Harvard, #C1008 CA 92614 / US | |||
Former [2001/47] | 01 /
Hoke, Bryan Clair 234 Longwood Drive Bethlehem, PA 18020 / US | ||
02 /
Lievre, Kevin Alan 1115 Greenleaf Circle Allentown, PA 18103 / US | |||
03 /
Slavejkov, Aleksandar Georgi 216 Murray Drive Allentown, PA 18104 / US | |||
04 /
Inskip, Julian Leonard 12 Waterside Cottages, Cholmondeley Road, Wrenbury Nantwich, Cheshire CW5 8GZ / GB | |||
05 /
Marchiando, Robert Dean 1176 Sharonbrook Drive Twinsburg, OH 44087 / US | |||
06 /
Eng, Robert Michael 17595 Harvard, #1008 CA 92614 / US | |||
Former [2001/39] | 01 /
Hoke, Bryan Clair 234 Longwood Drive Bethlehem, PA 18020 / US | ||
02 /
Lievre, Kevin Alan 1115 Greenleaf Circle Allentown, PA 18103 / US | |||
03 /
Slavejkov, Aleksandar Georgi 216 Murray Drive Allentown, PA 18104 / US | |||
04 /
Inskip, Julian Leonard 12 Waterside Cottages, Cholmondeley Road, Wrenbury Nantwich, Cheshire CW5 8GZ / GB | |||
05 /
Marchiando, Robert Dean 1176 Sharonbrook Drive Twinsburg, OH 44087 / US | |||
06 /
Eng, Robert Michael 102 Agostino Irvine, CA 92614 / US | Representative(s) | Burford, Anthony Frederick Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/39] | Burford, Anthony Frederick W.H. Beck, Greener & Co. 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn London WC2A 3SZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01302596.0 | 21.03.2001 | [2001/39] | Priority number, date | US20000534905 | 23.03.2000 Original published format: US 534905 | [2001/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1136451 | Date: | 26.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1136451 | Date: | 23.01.2002 | [2002/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1136451 | Date: | 22.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C03B5/235 | [2001/39] | CPC: |
C03B5/235 (EP,US);
C03B5/00 (KR);
C03B5/2353 (EP,US);
Y02P40/50 (EP,US);
Y02P40/57 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/39] | Title | German: | Glasschmelzverfahren und Ofen dafür mit Sauerstoff-Brennstoffverbrennung in der Schmelzzone und Luft-Brennstoffverbrennung in der Lauterzone | [2001/39] | English: | Glass melting process and furnace therefor with oxy-fuel combustion over melting zone and air-fuel combustion over fining zone | [2001/39] | French: | Procédé de fusion de verre et four pour appliquer ledit procédé avec combustion par oxygène-carburant dans la zone de fusion et combustion par air-carburant dans la zone de raffinage | [2001/39] | Examination procedure | 13.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/37] | 05.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
20.07.2004
29.07.2004
ADMISSIBLE Pilkington Group Limited Prescot Road St. Helens Merseyside WA10 3TT / GB Opponent's representative Jenkins, Peter David, et al, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | 02
20.07.2004
23.08.2004
ADMISSIBLE L'AIR LIQUIDE S.A. 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR Opponent's representative Conan, Philippe Claude, et al, et al L'Air Liquide SA Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle 75, quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.07.2004
29.07.2004
ADMISSIBLE Pilkington Group Limited Prescot Road St. Helens Merseyside WA10 3TT / GB Opponent's representative Jenkins, Peter David, et al, et al Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London, WC1N 2BF / GB | ||
02
20.07.2004
23.08.2004
ADMISSIBLE L'AIR LIQUIDE S.A. 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR Opponent's representative Conan, Philippe Claude, et al, et al L'Air Liquide D.S.P.I. 75, quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | |||
Former [2004/38] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.07.2004
29.07.2004
ADMISSIBLE Pilkington plc Prescot Road St. Helens, Merseyside WA10 3TT / GB Opponent's representative Jenkins, Peter David, et al, et al PAGE WHITE & FARRER 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | ||
02
20.07.2004
L'AIR LIQUIDE S.A. 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR Opponent's representative Conan, Philippe Claude, et al, et al L'Air Liquide D.S.P.I. 75, quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | |||
Former [2004/37] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.07.2004
Pilkington Insulation Limited Prescot Road St. Helens, Merseyside WA10 3TT / GB Opponent's representative Jenkins, Peter David, et al, et al PAGE WHITE & FARRER 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | ||
02
20.07.2004
L'AIR LIQUIDE S.A. 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR Opponent's representative Conan, Philippe Claude, et al, et al L'Air Liquide D.S.P.I. 75, quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | 30.08.2004 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 14.02.2005 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 30.11.2005 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.01.2006 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 04.01.2006 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 26.06.2008 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2009/28] | 26.06.2008 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 03.03.2006 | Appeal received No. T0283/06 | 11.05.2006 | Statement of grounds filed | 26.06.2008 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 01.03.2006 | Appeal received No. T0283/06 | 24.02.2006 | Appeal received | 26.06.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.07.2008 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.10.2003 | CH | 22.10.2003 | CY | 22.10.2003 | FI | 22.10.2003 | LI | 22.10.2003 | TR | 22.10.2003 | DK | 22.01.2004 | GR | 22.01.2004 | PT | 22.03.2004 | MC | 31.03.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/09] | AT | 22.10.2003 | |
CH | 22.10.2003 | ||
CY | 22.10.2003 | ||
FI | 22.10.2003 | ||
LI | 22.10.2003 | ||
TR | 22.10.2003 | ||
DK | 22.01.2004 | ||
GR | 22.01.2004 | ||
MC | 31.03.2004 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 22.10.2003 | |
CH | 22.10.2003 | ||
FI | 22.10.2003 | ||
LI | 22.10.2003 | ||
TR | 22.10.2003 | ||
DK | 22.01.2004 | ||
GR | 22.01.2004 | ||
MC | 31.03.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 22.10.2003 | |
CH | 22.10.2003 | ||
FI | 22.10.2003 | ||
LI | 22.10.2003 | ||
DK | 22.01.2004 | ||
GR | 22.01.2004 | ||
MC | 31.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | AT | 22.10.2003 | |
CH | 22.10.2003 | ||
FI | 22.10.2003 | ||
LI | 22.10.2003 | ||
DK | 22.01.2004 | ||
GR | 22.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/33] | AT | 22.10.2003 | |
CH | 22.10.2003 | ||
FI | 22.10.2003 | ||
LI | 22.10.2003 | ||
GR | 22.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/31] | AT | 22.10.2003 | |
FI | 22.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/26] | FI | 22.10.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0127513 (AIR LIQUIDE [FR]) [X] 1,16 * the whole document *; | [PX]EP1077201 (BOC GROUP INC [US]) [PX] 1,16* the whole document * |