EP1145965 - Fastening element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.04.2005 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.06.2005 [2005/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kotec's Co. Ltd. 1-37-8, Higashi-Nippori, Arakawa-ku Tokyo / JP | For all designated states Sanyo Seisakusho Co., Ltd. 177, Shimoshiota, Narumi-cho Midori-ku, Nagoya-shi Aichi / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/42] | For all designated states Kotec's Co. Ltd. 1-37-8, Higashi-Nippori, Arakawa-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states Sanyo Seisakusho Co., Ltd. 177, Shimoshiota, Narumi-cho Midori-ku, Nagoya-shi, Aichi / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Goto, Akihiro c/o Sanyo Seisakusho Co.,Ltd 177,Shimoshiota Narumi-cho, Midori-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi / JP | 02 /
Ueno, Hideyuki 9-7, Hino 7-chome, Kounan-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | [2004/23] |
Former [2004/21] | 01 /
Goto, Akihiro c/o Sanyo Seisakusho Co.,Ltd 177,Shimoshiota Naru mi-cho, Midori-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi / JP | ||
02 /
Ueno, Hideyuki 9-7, Hino 7-chome, Kounan-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | |||
Former [2002/06] | 01 /
Goto, Akihiro 177, Shimoshiota, Narumi-cho, Midori-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi / JP | ||
02 /
Ueno, Hideyuki 9-7, Hino 7-chome, Kounan-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | |||
Former [2001/42] | 01 /
Goto, Akihiro 177, Shimoshiota, Narumi-cho, Midori-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi / JP | Representative(s) | Dealtry, Brian Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/42] | Dealtry, Brian Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 01302632.3 | 21.03.2001 | [2001/42] | Priority number, date | JP20000078707 | 21.03.2000 Original published format: JP 2000078707 | [2001/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1145965 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/42] | Type: | A8 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP1145965 | Date: | 27.02.2002 | [2002/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1145965 | Date: | 16.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B65C7/00 | [2001/42] | CPC: |
G09F3/037 (EP,US);
B65C7/00 (KR);
G09F3/14 (EP,US);
Y10T24/1498 (EP,US);
Y10T292/496 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2002/27] |
Former [2001/42] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Befestigungselement | [2001/42] | English: | Fastening element | [2001/42] | French: | Elément de fixation | [2001/42] | Examination procedure | 06.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/42] | 19.09.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]GB2103274 (JAPAN BANOK CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-14; | [A]US5772073 (DESCHENES CHARLES L [US]) [A] 1-14 * column 2, line 59 - column 3, line 10 ** figures 1-4 *; | [XA]US5799375 (FUKAMI SHOICHI [JP]) [X] 1 * column 7, line 24 - column 8, line 65 * * figures 7,16 * [A] 2-14 |