EP1143653 - Multilevel coding with unequal error protection and time diversity for bandwidth efficient transmission [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.07.2011 [2011/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill NJ 07974-0636 / US | ||
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chung, Sae-Young 540 Memorial Drive, No. 1406 Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | 02 /
Lou, Hui-Ling 41 Ethan Drive, Apt. 1A Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974 / US | [2001/41] | Representative(s) | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Ltd Patent Business c/o Nokia 125 Finsbury Pavement London EC2A 1NQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/46] | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Limited Unit 18, Core 3, Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield EN3 7XU / GB | ||
Former [2005/32] | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Lucent Technologies NS UK Limited, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB | ||
Former [2005/24] | Funnell, Samantha Jane, et al Lucent Technologies UK Limited, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB | ||
Former [2001/41] | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 01302770.1 | 26.03.2001 | [2001/41] | Priority number, date | US20000195506 | 06.04.2000 Original published format: US 195506 | US20010765754 | 19.01.2001 Original published format: US 765754 | [2001/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1143653 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1143653 | Date: | 06.09.2006 | [2006/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1143653 | Date: | 28.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/00, H04L27/34 | [2001/41] | CPC: |
H04L1/0041 (EP,US);
H04L1/0058 (EP,US);
H04L1/0065 (EP,US);
H04L1/007 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/19] |
Former [2001/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Mehrpegelkodierung mit ungleichem Fehlerschutz und Zeitdiversität zur bandbreiteneffizienten Übertragung | [2001/41] | English: | Multilevel coding with unequal error protection and time diversity for bandwidth efficient transmission | [2001/41] | French: | Codage à niveaux multiples avec protection d'erreurs à niveaux inégaux et diversité temporelle pour transmission éfficace en largeur de bande | [2001/41] | Examination procedure | 28.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/15] | 02.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5416804 (KHALED FAZEL [FR], et al) [X] 1-19,23-25 * column 3, line 50 - line 65 * * column 5, line 9 - line 21 * * column 6, line 55 - column 7, line 66 * * column 8, line 49 - line 64 *; | [X]EP0610648 (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-15,19-25 * column 1, line 56 - column 2, line 11 * * column 2, line 38 - line 48 * * column 3, line 5 - line 26 * * column 4, line 19 - column 5, line 3 * * column 5, line 28 - line 46 * * column 6, line 14 - line 21 * * column 6, line 53 - column 7, line 15 * * column 9, line 12 - line 22; figures 1,6 *; | [X]EP0490552 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [X] 1-6,19,23-25 * column 2, line 16 - line 29 * * column 4, line 1 - line 22 * * column 5, line 11 - line 46 * * column 7, line 19 - line 51 * * column 8, line 13 - line 25; figures 3,9 *; | [X]EP0624018 (AT & T CORP [US]) [X] 1-4,6,19,23-25 * column 3, line 29 - column 4, line 39 * * column 5, line 20 - line 25 * * column 7, line 34 - line 47 * * column 8, line 30 - line 55 * * column 9, line 40 - line 51 * * column 14, line 33 - line 56 * * figures 1,8,10,19,26 * | by applicant | US5416804 | - G. UNGERBOECK, "Trellis-Coded Modulation with Redundant Signal Sets, Part I. Introduction", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS MAGAZINE, (198702), vol. 25, no. 2, pages 4 - 11 | - G. UNGERBOECK, "Trellis-Coded Modulation with Redundant Signal Sets, Part II: State of the Art", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS MAGAZINE, (198702), vol. 25, no. 2, pages 12 - 21 |