EP1245570 - Process for the production of (-) 3,4 divanillyl tetrahydrofuran [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.2005 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.12.2005 [2005/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Council of Scientific and Industrial Research Rafi Marg New Delhi 110 001 / IN | [N/P] |
Former [2002/40] | For all designated states Council of Scientific and Industrial Research Rafi Marg New Delhi 110 001 / IN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chattopadhyay, Sunil Kumar Cen. Inst. of Med. and Aromatic Plants, P.O. CIMAP Lucknow 226015 Uttar Pradesh / IN | 02 /
Srivastava, Sachin Cen. Inst. of Med. and Aromatic Plants, P.O. CIMAP Lucknow 226015 Uttar Pradesh / IN | 03 /
Tripathi, Vinayak Cen. Inst. of Med. and Aromatic Plants, P.O. CIMAP Lucknow 226015 Uttar Pradesh / IN | [2002/40] | Representative(s) | Towler, Philip Dean Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/40] | Towler, Philip Dean Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 01303077.0 | 30.03.2001 | [2002/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1245570 | Date: | 02.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1245570 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C07D307/08 | [2002/40] | CPC: |
C07D307/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, LI, SE [2003/26] |
Former [2002/40] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von (-) 3,4 Divanillyltetrahydrofuran | [2002/40] | English: | Process for the production of (-) 3,4 divanillyl tetrahydrofuran | [2002/40] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation de (-) 3,4 divanillyl tétrahydofurane | [2002/40] | Examination procedure | 02.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/22] | 03.04.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.07.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, TR | 27.01.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 06.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/51] | Request for further processing for: | 06.04.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 06.04.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.04.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 15.05.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - SCHOETTNER M ET AL, "LIGNANS FROM THE ROOTS OF URTICA DIOICA AND THEIR METABOLITES BIND TO HUMAN SEX HORMONE BINDING GLOBULIN (SHBG)", PLANTA MEDICA, THIEME, STUTTGART, DE, (1997), vol. 63, ISSN 0032-0943, pages 529 - 532, XP001012826 [A] 1-22 * page 531 * | [AD] - MUJUMDAR R B ET AL, "TAXIRESINOL, A NEW LIGNAN IN THE HEARTWOOD OF TAXUS BACCATA", INDIAN JOURNAL OF CHEMISTRY, JODHPUR, IN, (197207), vol. 10, pages 677 - 680, XP001012828 [AD] 1-22 * page 677 * | [A] - BARRY C N ET AL, "TRIPHENYLPHOSPHINE-TETRACHLOROMETHANE PROMOTED CHLORINATION AND CYCLODEHYDRATION OF SIMPLE DIOLS", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. EASTON, US, (19810731), vol. 46, no. 16, ISSN 0022-3263, pages 3361 - 3364, XP000673385 [A] 1-22 * figure I * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00329a052 | [A] - SHU-FANG ET AL., "Lycorine Alkaloids from Hymenocallis Littoralis", PHYTOCHEMISTRY, (1995), vol. 40, no. 4, pages 1295 - 1298, XP002177724 [A] 1-22 * paragraph [EXPERIMENTAL] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0031-9422(95)00372-E |