EP1146171 - Paper having improved print quality and method of making the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.2008 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY 100 Independence Mall West Philadelphia, PA 19106-2399 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/30] | For all designated states ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY 100 Independence Mall West Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19106-2399 / US | ||
Former [2001/42] | For all designated states ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY 100 Independence Mall West Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19106-2399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bobsein, Barrett Richard 9 Narothyn Road Sellersville, Pennsylvania 18960 / US | 02 /
Brown, James Tinney 254 Washington Road Bechtelsville, Pennsylvania 19505 / US | 03 /
Fu, Zhenwen 101 Torey Circle Lansdale, Pennsylvania 19446 / US | 04 /
Windisch, Janet Drobits 1740 Green Hill Road Collegeville, Pennsylvania 19426 / US | [2001/42] | Representative(s) | Kent, Venetia Katherine Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Kent, Venetia Katherine Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE 45 1DZ / GB | ||
Former [2001/42] | Kent, Venetia Katherine Rohm and Haas (UK) Ltd European Operations Patent Dept. Lennig House 2 Mason's Avenue Croydon, CR9 3NB / GB | Application number, filing date | 01303394.9 | 11.04.2001 | [2001/42] | Priority number, date | US20010825303P | 04.04.2001 Original published format: US 825303 P | US20000196374P | 12.04.2000 Original published format: US 196374 P | [2001/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1146171 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1146171 | Date: | 25.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | D21H19/38, // D21H23/22 | [2007/09] | CPC: |
D21H19/38 (EP,US);
D21H19/00 (KR);
D21H19/42 (EP,US);
D21H21/52 (EP,US);
D21H21/54 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24934 (EP,US);
Y10T428/277 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2001/42] | D21H19/38, // D21H23:22 | Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, IT, SE [2002/27] |
Former [2001/42] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Papier mit verbesserter Bedruckbarkeit und Verfahren zur Herstellung desselben | [2001/42] | English: | Paper having improved print quality and method of making the same | [2001/42] | French: | Papier ayant une printabilitee amelioree ainsi qu'un procede pour sa fabrication | [2001/42] | Examination procedure | 30.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/42] | 09.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 25.10.2007 | FR | 21.03.2008 | GB | 11.04.2008 | [2009/29] |
Former [2008/32] | SE | 25.10.2007 | |
FR | 21.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | SE | 25.10.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JPH05230795 ; | [A]EP0179597 (PFIZER [US]); | [A]EP0244250 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]); | [AD]US4751111 (LEE DO I [US], et al) [AD] 1-32 * claim - *; | [A]EP0342283 (ROHM & HAAS [US]); | [Y]US5510422 (BLANKENSHIP ROBERT M [US], et al) [Y] 1-32 * column 6, line 26 - line 33 * * claim 1 *; | [YD]EP0842992 (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [YD] 1-32 * claims 1,7-10 *; | [XDY]US5922457 (YANAGISAWA KENJI [JP], et al) [XD] 14-16,30-32 * abstract * * example 3 * * column 6, lines 11-13 * * the whole document * [Y] 1-13,17-29; | [AD] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1993, no. 40, Database accession no. 1993-318012, XP002169603 & JPH05230795 A 19930907 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEM INC) [AD] 1-3,8,14,17-19,24,30 * abstract * |