EP1150395 - Electrical connector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.01.2005 [2005/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oxley Developments Company Limited Priory Park Ulverston Cumbria LA12 9QG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/44] | For all designated states Oxley Developments Company Limited Priory Park Ulverston Cumbria LA12 9QG / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Armistead, Trevor 10 Central Drive Ulverston, Cumbria, LA12 9 LD / GB | 02 /
Armistead, Robert Graham 9 Kingsley Avenue, Swarthmoor Ulverston, Cumbria, LA12 0JD / GB | [2001/44] | Representative(s) | WP Thompson 8th Floor 1 Mann Island Liverpool L3 1BP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/44] | W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building, Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | Application number, filing date | 01303739.5 | 24.04.2001 | [2001/44] | Priority number, date | GB20000010282 | 27.04.2000 Original published format: GB 0010282 | [2001/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1150395 | Date: | 31.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1150395 | Date: | 03.04.2002 | [2002/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1150395 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/66, H01R4/48 | [2002/13] | CPC: |
H01R13/2421 (EP,US);
H01R12/58 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/44] | H01R13/66 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2003/01] |
Former [2001/44] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Steckverbinder | [2001/44] | English: | Electrical connector | [2001/44] | French: | Connecteur électrique | [2001/44] | Examination procedure | 10.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/46] | 05.10.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.11.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 12.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.11.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.2001 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3258736 (D J CRAWFORD, J K PICCIANO, F L POST) [X] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [X]US4192567 (GOMOLKA WILLIAM [US]) [X] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0742682 (SGS THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS [US]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]US4620761 (SMITH BRIAN M [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * the whole document * |