EP1154667 - Method and apparatus for multi-user resource management in wireless communication systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.08.2009 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 16.09.2009 [2009/38] | 14.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.09.2009 [2009/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill NJ 07974-0636 / US | ||
Former [2008/41] | For all designated states Lucent Technologies Inc. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill NJ 07974-0636 / US | ||
Former [2001/46] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lu, Ming 70 Nostrand Road Hillsborough, New Jersey 08876 / US | 02 /
Rudrapatna, Ashok N. 34 Knollcroft Road Basking Ridge, New Jersey 07920 / US | 03 /
Zhu, Pengfei 33 Cold Hill Road Morris Plains, New Jersey 07950 / US | [2001/46] | Representative(s) | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Ltd Patent Business c/o Nokia 125 Finsbury Pavement London EC2A 1NQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/46] | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Limited Unit 18, Core 3, Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield EN3 7XU / GB | ||
Former [2006/09] | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Lucent Technologie NS UK Limited 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB | ||
Former [2001/46] | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, Dr., et al Lucent Technologies NS UK Limited, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 01303941.7 | 30.04.2001 | [2001/46] | Priority number, date | US20000568921 | 11.05.2000 Original published format: US 568921 | [2001/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1154667 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1154667 | Date: | 13.03.2002 | [2002/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1154667 | Date: | 08.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/38 | [2001/46] | CPC: |
H04W72/02 (EP,US);
H04W72/04 (EP,KR,US);
H04W28/0268 (KR);
H04W28/06 (KR);
H04W72/54 (KR);
H04W24/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, SE [2002/49] |
Former [2001/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung für Mehrbenutzer-Betriebsmittelverwaltung in drahtlosen Kommunikationssystemen | [2001/46] | English: | Method and apparatus for multi-user resource management in wireless communication systems | [2001/46] | French: | Procédé et système pour la gestion multi-utilisateur de ressources dans des systèmes de communication sans fil | [2008/19] |
Former [2001/46] | Procédé et système pour gestion multi-utilisateur de ressources dans des systèmes de communication sans fil | Examination procedure | 31.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/45] | 29.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 08.10.2008 | SE | 08.01.2009 | [2009/38] |
Former [2009/25] | FI | 08.10.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6005852 (KOKKO ISMO [FI], et al); | [E]WO0141376 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) |