EP1152364 - Method and apparatus for automatic setting of sample gate in pulsed doppler ultrasound imaging [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.08.2008 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GE Medical Systems Global Technology Company LLC 3000 North Grandview Boulevard W-710 Waukesha Wisconsin 53188 / US | [2007/39] |
Former [2001/45] | For all designated states GE Medical Systems Global Technology Company LLC 3000 North Grandview Boulevard W-710 Waukesha, Wisconsin 53188 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pan, Lihong 4790 Old Church Road Brookfield, Wisconsin 53045 / US | 02 /
Mo, Larry Y.L. 1707 Saratoga Road Waukesha, Wisconsin 53186 / US | 03 /
Washburn, Michael Joseph 18480 Krestrel Trail Brookfield, Wisconsin 53045 / US | 04 /
Dong, Fang 2901 Woodridge Lane Waukesha, Wisconsin 53188 / US | [2002/15] |
Former [2001/45] | 01 /
Pan, Lihong 4790 Old Church Road Brookfield, Wisconsin 53045 / US | ||
02 /
Mo, Larry Y.L. 1707 Saratoga Road Waukesha, Wisconsin 53186 / US | |||
03 /
Washburn, Michael Joseph 12920 West Graham Street New Berlin, Wisconsin 53151 / US | |||
04 /
Dong, Fang 2901 Woodridge Lane Waukesha, Wisconsin 53188 / US | Representative(s) | Pedder, James Cuthbert London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/45] | Pedder, James Cuthbert GE London Patent Operation, Essex House, 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 01303952.4 | 30.04.2001 | [2001/45] | Priority number, date | US20000563538 | 01.05.2000 Original published format: US 563538 | US20000656659 | 07.09.2000 Original published format: US 656659 | [2001/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1152364 | Date: | 07.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1152364 | Date: | 23.03.2005 | [2005/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1152364 | Date: | 26.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/00, A61B8/06, G06T7/00 | [2005/12] | CPC: |
A61B8/06 (EP);
A61B8/488 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/45] | G06F19/00, A61B8/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, NL [2005/50] |
Former [2001/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren and Vorrichtung zum automatischen Einstellen eines Abtasttores in Puls-Dopplerultraschallbildgebung | [2001/45] | English: | Method and apparatus for automatic setting of sample gate in pulsed doppler ultrasound imaging | [2001/45] | French: | Méthode et dispositif pour la configuration automatique d'une porte d'échantillonage dans un système d'imagerie par ultrasons à effet Doppler impulsionnel | [2001/45] | Examination procedure | 23.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/47] | 11.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 26.09.2007 | [2008/24] | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO0162155 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [E] 1,5,9 * page 10, line 9 - page 16, line 3; claim 1 *; | [E]EP1176910 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [E] 1,5,9; | [XY]US6048314 (NIKOM JACOB [US]) [X] 1,5,9 * column 5, line 45 - column 9, line 30; claims 1-14 * [Y] 2-4,6-8,10; | [YD]US5365929 (PETERSON ROY B [US]) [YD] 2-4,6-8,10 * column 3, line 52 - column 4, line 48 *; | [A]JPH06217975 ; | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941108), vol. 018, no. 582, Database accession no. (C - 1270), & JP06217975 A 19940809 (TOSHIBA MEDICAL ENG CO LTD; others: 01) [A] 1-10 * abstract * | [A] - THORNE G C ET AL, "BLOOD FLOW MEASUREMENT BY DOPPLER ULTRASOUND: A QUESTION OF ANGLES", PHYSICS IN MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY, TAYLOR AND FRANCIS LTD. LONDON, GB, (19931101), vol. 38, no. 11, ISSN 0031-9155, pages 1637 - 1645, XP000404193 [A] 1,3,5,7,9 * page 1640, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0031-9155/38/11/009 | Examination | EP0842638 | by applicant | US5365929 | EP0842638 | EP0985380 | US5690116 | US6068598 | US4937797 |