EP1184095 - Method and apparatus for interchanging ring rolls of a bar and wire rod mill [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.01.2004 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2004 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.03.2004 [2004/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JFE Steel Corporation 2-3, Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/49] | For all designated states JFE Steel Corporation 2-3, Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2002/10] | For all designated states Kawasaki Steel Corporation 1-28 Kitahonmachidori 1-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-0075 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ryo, Takeda Kawasakidori 1-chome, Mizushima Kurashiki-shi, Okayama 712-8074 / JP | 02 /
Yoshihiro, Shinkai Kawasakidori 1-chome, Mizushima Kurashiki-shi, Okayama 712-8074 / JP | [2002/10] | Representative(s) | Overbury, Richard Douglas Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | [2002/10] | Application number, filing date | 01304161.1 | 09.05.2001 | [2002/10] | Priority number, date | JP20000258800 | 29.08.2000 Original published format: JP 2000258800 | JP20000330941 | 30.10.2000 Original published format: JP 2000330941 | [2002/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1184095 | Date: | 06.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1184095 | Date: | 16.07.2003 | [2003/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B21B31/08 | [2002/10] | CPC: |
B21B31/08 (EP,KR,US);
B21B13/103 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Auswechseln von Walzringen eines Stabstahl- und Drahtwalzwerkes | [2002/10] | English: | Method and apparatus for interchanging ring rolls of a bar and wire rod mill | [2002/10] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour le remplacement des bagues de laminage d'un laminoir à barres et à fils | [2002/10] | Examination procedure | 22.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/43] | 31.12.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE977216 (DEMAG AG) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]JPS5847301U (...) [A] 1-9 * figure - *; | [A]EP0479749 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]US5657540 (REGENBERG WOLFGANG [DE]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0904862 (SUMITOMO HEAVY INDUSTRIES [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [D]JPH11104706 (SUMITOMO HEAVY INDUSTRIES, et al) | [XA] - BRAUER H, "WEITERENTWICKLUNGEN DER DREIWALZEN-UMFORMBLÖCKE", STAHL UND EISEN, VERLAG STAHLEISEN GMBH. DÜSSELDORF, DE, (19920715), vol. 112, no. 7, ISSN 0340-4803, pages 53 - 60,130, XP000293327 [X] 1,4 * page 57; figure 8 * [A] 2,3,5-9 | [XA] - BLOS E O ET AL, "NEW DEVELOPMENTS IN ROD MILLS", IRON AND STEEL ENGINEER., ASSOCIATION OF IRON AND STEEL ENGINEERS. PITTSBURGH., US, (198612), vol. 63, no. 12, ISSN 0021-1559, pages 35 - 46, XP002241240 [X] 1,4 * page 37 - page 38; figure 8 * [A] 2,3,5-9 |