EP1156335 - Quantitative analysis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.02.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.03.2013 [2013/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARKRAY, Inc. 57, Nishiaketa-cho Higashikujo Minami-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 601-8045 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2012/13] | For all designated states ARKRAY, Inc. 57, Nishi Aketa-Cho, Higashi-kujo, Minami-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 601-8045 / JP | ||
Former [2001/47] | For all designated states ARKRAY, Inc. 57, Nishi Aketa-Cho, Higashi-kujo, Minami-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 601-8045 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Noda, Yuichiro, c/o Arkray, Inc. 57 Nishiaketa-cho Higashikujo Minami-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 601-8045 / JP | 02 /
Tanaka, Yoshiyuki, c/o Arkray, Inc. 57 Nishiaketa-cho Higashikujo Minami-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 601-8045 / JP | 03 /
Hirao, Konomu, c/o Arkray, Inc. 57 Nishiaketa-cho Higashikujo Minami-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 601-8045 / JP | [2012/13] |
Former [2001/47] | 01 /
Noda, Yuichiro, c/o Arkray, Inc. 57 Nishiaketa-cho, Higashikujo, Minami-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 601-8045 / JP | ||
02 /
Tanaka, Yoshiyuki, c/o Arkray, Inc. 57 Nishiaketa-cho, Higashikujo, Minami-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 601-8045 / JP | |||
03 /
Hirao, Konomu, c/o Arkray, Inc. 57 Nishiaketa-cho, Higashikujo, Minami-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 601-8045 / JP | Representative(s) | Campbell, Neil Boyd Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/13] | Campbell, Neil Boyd Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2010/28] | Campbell, Neil Boyd Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2001/47] | Moy, David Frank B. Dehn & Co., 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 01304372.4 | 17.05.2001 | [2001/47] | Priority number, date | JP20000146498 | 18.05.2000 Original published format: JP 2000146498 | [2001/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1156335 | Date: | 21.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1156335 | Date: | 17.12.2003 | [2003/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1156335 | Date: | 28.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/84, C12Q1/52, C12Q1/48, C12Q1/61, C12Q1/40, G01N33/92, C12Q1/42, G01N33/96 | [2003/51] | CPC: |
G01N33/96 (EP,US);
Y10T436/10 (EP,US);
Y10T436/193333 (EP,US);
Y10T436/25 (EP,US);
Y10T436/255 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/47] | G01N33/84, C12Q1/52, C12Q1/48, C12Q1/61, C12Q1/40, G01N33/92, C12Q1/42 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/37] |
Former [2001/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Quantitative Analyse | [2001/47] | English: | Quantitative analysis | [2001/47] | French: | Analyse quantitatif | [2001/47] | Examination procedure | 04.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/32] | 18.06.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.10.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 17.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.03.2006 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 23.07.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.07.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.07.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 23.07.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 23.07.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 23.07.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 23.07.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 23.07.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 23.07.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.07.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 23.07.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 23.07.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 23.07.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.07.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.07.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3728226 (LOUDERBACK A) [X] 1-19 * see whole doec. esp. claim and tables *; | [X]WO9740376 ; | [A]EP0423784 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [A] * the whole document * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1997, no. 49, Database accession no. 1997-536000, XP002258442 & WO9740376 A 19971030 (IATRON LAB INC) [X] 1-19 * abstract * |