EP1160097 - Image forming method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.12.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.01.2010 [2010/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2 Nishishinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [2009/06] |
Former [2001/49] | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2 Nishishinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kaga, Makoto, c/o Konica Corporation 2970 Ishikawa-cho Hachioji-shi, Tokyo, 192-0032 / JP | 02 /
Tomotake, Atsuhsi, c/o Konica Corporation 2970 Ishikawa-cho Hachioji-shi, Tokyo, 192-0032 / JP | 03 /
Kida, Shuji, c/o Konica Corporation 2970 Ishikawa-cho Hachioji-shi, Tokyo, 192-0032 / JP | 04 /
Suzuki, Shinichi, c/o Konica Corporation 2970 Ishikawa-cho Hachioji-shi, Tokyo, 192-0032 / JP | 05 /
Ohya, Hidenobu, c/o Konica Corporation 2970 Ishikawa-cho Hachioji-shi, Tokyo, 192-0032 / JP | 06 /
Nakamura, Masaki, c/o Konica Corporation 2970 Ishikawa-cho Hachioji-shi, Tokyo, 192-0032 / JP | [2001/49] | Representative(s) | Nicholls, Michael John J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/49] | Nicholls, Michael John J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01304743.6 | 30.05.2001 | [2001/49] | Priority number, date | JP20000164386 | 01.06.2000 Original published format: JP 2000164386 | [2001/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1160097 | Date: | 05.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1160097 | Date: | 03.04.2002 | [2002/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1160097 | Date: | 04.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B41M7/00, B41M5/00 | [2001/49] | CPC: |
B41M5/52 (EP,US);
B41M7/00 (EP,US);
B41M5/529 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/01] |
Former [2001/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Bilderzeugungsverfahren | [2001/49] | English: | Image forming method | [2001/49] | French: | Méthode de formation d'une image | [2001/49] | Examination procedure | 10.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/46] | 20.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0233039 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1-4,9,12 * page 3, line 26 - line 33 * * page 4, line 10 - line 26 * * page 7, line 34 - line 53 * * page 8, line 10 - line 16 * * page 11, line 34 - line 35 * * page 14, line 24 - line 25 * [Y] 8,10,11; | [Y]EP0671268 (SONY CORP [JP]) [Y] 8 * page 3, line 8 - line 10 ** page 14, line 14 - line 19; figure 24 *; | [XY]JPH10291306 (CANON KK) [X] 1,2,4-7,9 * page 4, paragraph 16 - paragraph 20 * * page 6, paragraph 37 * * page 6, paragraph 41 * * page 7, paragraph 52 * * page 8, paragraph 54 * * figures 1-4 * [Y] 8,10,11; | [Y]JP2000015927 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND) [Y] 10,11 * page 6, paragraph 61 * * page 8, paragraph 82 - paragraph 84 * * page 8, paragraph 89 - page 9, paragraph 93; claim 2 * |