EP1162678 - Improved performance thermal battery [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.08.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states New EaglePicher Technologies, LLC "C" and Porter Streets Joplin, MO 64802 / US | [2007/01] |
Former [2006/52] | For all designated states EaglePicher Technologies, LLC "C" and Porter Streets Joplin, MO 64801 / US | ||
Former [2001/50] | For all designated states Eagle-Picher Technologies, L.L.C. "C" and Porter Streets Joplin, Missouri 64801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Spencer, Richard D. 502 Rudondo Drive Webb City, Missouri 64870 / US | [2008/40] |
Former [2001/50] | 01 /
Spencer, Richard D. 503 Rudondo Drive Webb City, Missouri 64870 / US | Representative(s) | Findlay, Alice Rosemary, et al Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/52] | Findlay, Alice Rosemary, et al Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2001/50] | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co., Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 01304767.5 | 31.05.2001 | [2001/50] | Priority number, date | US20000587444 | 05.06.2000 Original published format: US 587444 | [2001/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1162678 | Date: | 12.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1162678 | Date: | 07.05.2003 | [2003/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1162678 | Date: | 01.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01M6/36 | [2001/50] | CPC: |
H01M6/36 (EP,US);
H01M6/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/05] |
Former [2001/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Thermische Batterie mit verbesserter Leistung | [2001/50] | English: | Improved performance thermal battery | [2001/50] | French: | Batterie thermique à performance améliorée | [2001/50] | Examination procedure | 16.10.2003 | Examination requested [2003/51] | 06.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3639773 (AYD FRANK J, et al) [A] 1-3,8,11 * column 1, line 34 - column 2, line 13 *; | [A]US4044192 (BOWSER JR GEORGE C, et al) [A] 1-3,8,11 * column 1, line 36 - column 2, line 13 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US4054724 (GOLDSMITH HENRY J) [A] 1-3,8,11 * column 1, line 5 - column 2, line 64 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US4158084 (PRENTICE JACK L [US]) [A] 7* column 3, line 30 - line 32 *; | [A]US5382479 (SCHUSTER NICHOLAS [US]) [A] 4 * column 2, line 1 - line 3 * * figures 1,2 * |