EP1177892 - A composite for fine and graphic art applications and method for making composite [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.05.2004 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.2004 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.06.2004 [2004/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kaplan, Daniel Benjamin 10 Lubrano Street East Brighton Victoria 3194 / AU | For all designated states Whitham, Anthony Richard Lot 2998 Jalan Raya Merbok 08400 Merbok Kedah Darul Aman / MY | [N/P] |
Former [2002/06] | For all designated states Kaplan, Daniel Benjamin 10 Lubrano Street East Brighton, Victoria 3194 / AU | ||
For all designated states Whitman, Anthony Richard Lot 2998 Jalan Raya Merbok 08400 Merbok, Kedah Darul Aman / MY | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/06] | Representative(s) | WP Thompson 8th Floor 1 Mann Island Liverpool L3 1BP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/06] | W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building, Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | Application number, filing date | 01304776.6 | 31.05.2001 | [2002/06] | Priority number, date | US20000626667 | 27.07.2000 Original published format: US 626667 | [2002/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1177892 | Date: | 06.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1177892 | Date: | 17.12.2003 | [2003/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B32B21/06, C08J7/04, B44D3/18 | [2003/51] | CPC: |
B32B21/06 (EP,US);
B44C1/24 (EP,US);
B44C5/0469 (EP,US);
B44D3/18 (EP,US);
B32B2317/125 (EP,US);
B32B2317/16 (EP,US);
B32B38/06 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24843 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24934 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24942 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2495 (EP,US);
Y10T428/273 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2002/06] | B32B21/06, C08J7/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verbundwerkstoff für feine und kunstgrafische Anwendungen und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung | [2002/06] | English: | A composite for fine and graphic art applications and method for making composite | [2002/06] | French: | Stratifié pour applications d'art graphique fine et procédé pour la fabrication d'un tel stratifié | [2002/06] | Examination procedure | 30.04.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4065596 (GROODY JAMES) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * column 1, line 4 - column 4, line 23 *; | [A]US2742724 (HYMAN FLEISS) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]US5360664 (HAMM JAMES F [US]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document * |