EP1161912 - Electric toaster [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.03.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.05.2003 [2003/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Simatelex Manufactory Company Limited 9th Floor, Chai Wan Industrial Centre, 20 Lee Chung Street Chai Wan Hong Kong / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2001/50] | For all designated states Simatelex Manufactory Company Limited 9th Floor, Chai Wan Industrial Centre, 20 Lee Chung Street Chai Wan, Hong Kong / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chan, Stephen Wai-Kin 9th floor, Chai Wan Ind. Ctr., 20, Lee Chung St. Chai Wan, Hong Kong / CN | 02 /
Li, Wing chung 9th floor, Chai Wan Ind. Ctr., 20, Lee Chung St. Chai Wan, Hong Kong / CN | [2001/50] | Representative(s) | Godwin, Edgar James Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/50] | Godwin, Edgar James MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 01304898.8 | 05.06.2001 | [2001/50] | Priority number, date | GB20000013672 | 05.06.2000 Original published format: GB 0013672 | [2001/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1161912 | Date: | 12.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A47J37/08 | [2001/50] | CPC: |
A47J37/0814 (EP,US);
A47J37/0842 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/50] | Title | German: | Elektrischer Toaster | [2001/50] | English: | Electric toaster | [2001/50] | French: | Grille-pain électrique | [2001/50] | Examination procedure | 15.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/25] | 28.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/20] | 13.12.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/20] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5283421 (RICHARDS DAVID A [AU]) [X] 1-3 * column 3, lines 4-46; figure 1 *; | [X]US5304782 (MCNAIR JOHN D [AU], et al) [X] 1-3* column 4, line 44 - column 5, line 2; figure 2 *; | [X]DE19606507 (ROWENTA WERKE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3 * column 2, lines 23-58; figure .; claim 1 * |