EP1164117 - Process for producing adamantane [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.06.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC. Mitsubishi Building, 5-2 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8324 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/51] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company, Inc. Mitsubishi Building, 5-2 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8324 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawai, Takeshi Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company Inc., Wadai 22 Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki-ken / JP | 02 /
Ueno, Wataru Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company Inc., Wadai 22 Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki-ken / JP | 03 /
Fujiura, Ryuuji Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company Inc., Wadai 22 Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki-ken / JP | [2001/51] | Representative(s) | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2001/51] | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett J.A. KEMP & CO., Gray's Inn, 14 South Square London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 01305140.4 | 13.06.2001 | [2001/51] | Priority number, date | JP20000176725 | 13.06.2000 Original published format: JP 2000176725 | [2001/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1164117 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1164117 | Date: | 13.03.2002 | [2002/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C07C5/29, C07C13/615 | [2001/51] | CPC: |
C07C5/29 (EP,US);
C07C2523/42 (EP,US);
C07C2523/44 (EP,US);
C07C2523/46 (EP,US);
C07C2523/745 (EP,US);
C07C2523/75 (EP,US);
C07C2523/755 (EP,US);
C07C2527/1206 (EP,US);
C07C2527/1213 (EP,US);
C07C2603/74 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C5/29, C07C13/615 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2002/49] |
Former [2001/51] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Adamantan | [2001/51] | English: | Process for producing adamantane | [2001/51] | French: | Procédé de préparation de l'adamantane | [2001/51] | Examination procedure | 14.09.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/30] | 21.01.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/30] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 05.11.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2002 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.2002 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 05.11.2002 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JPS5035151 ; | [AD]JPS60246333 | [AD] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1975, no. 32, Database accession no. 1975-53041W, XP002186941 & JPS5035151 A 19750403 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEM IND CO LTD) [AD] 1-5 * abstract * | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860506), vol. 010, no. 120, Database accession no. (C - 343), & JP60246333 A 19851206 (IDEMITSU KOSAN KK) [AD] 1-5 * abstract * |