EP1175994 - Press machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 11.07.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Refusal of application | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aida Engineering Co., Ltd. 2-10, Ohyama-cho Sagamihara-shi Kanagawa 229-1181 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/05] | For all designated states Aida Engineering Co., Ltd. 2-10, Ohyama-cho Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa 229-1181 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kobayashi, Kujuro, c/o Aida Engineering Co. Ltd. 2-10 Ohyama-Cho Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa 229-1181 / JP | 02 /
Kawahara, Takashi, c/o Aida Engineering Co. Ltd. 2-10 Ohyama-Cho Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa 229-1181 / JP | 03 /
Maeda, Nobuyoshi 2-10 Ohyama-Cho Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa 229-1181 / JP | [2005/27] |
Former [2002/05] | 01 /
Kobayashi, Kujuro, c/o Aida Engineering Co. Ltd. 2-10 Ohyama-Cho Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa 229-1181 / JP | ||
02 /
Kawahara, Takashi, c/o Aida Engineering Co. Ltd. 2-10 Ohyama-Cho Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa 229-1181 / JP | |||
03 /
Maeda, Nobuyashi 2-10 Ohyama-Cho Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa 229-1181 / JP | Representative(s) | Shelley, Mark Raymond, et al Bryer, Shelley, John Amor, Greenwood LLP 7 Gay Street Bath BA1 2PH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/05] | Shelley, Mark Raymond, et al K R Bryer & Co., 7 Gay Street Bath BA1 2PH / GB | Application number, filing date | 01305537.1 | 26.06.2001 | [2002/05] | Priority number, date | JP20000190871 | 26.06.2000 Original published format: JP 2000190871 | [2002/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1175994 | Date: | 30.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1175994 | Date: | 02.04.2003 | [2003/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B30B1/26, B30B15/04 | [2002/49] | CPC: |
B30B1/266 (EP,US);
B30B15/041 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/05] | B30B1/26 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2004/01] |
Former [2002/05] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Presse | [2002/05] | English: | Press machine | [2002/05] | French: | Presse | [2002/05] | Examination procedure | 04.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/45] | 21.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2007 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 23.10.2007 | 22.10.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 23.10.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.10.2007 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 26.03.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2008/33] | 05.04.2008 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2008/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4161342 (NELSEN ROGER J [US]) [X] 1,5-7,9 * figure - * [Y] 2-4,8; | [YX]US3572137 (NAKANO KOHJI) [Y] 2,3,8 * column 3, line 38 - column 4, line 50; figure - * [X] 10; | [Y]JPH0910998 ; | [X]DE2218438 (DORST KERAMIKMASCH) [X] 1,5-7,9 * figure - *; | [AX]US3869927 (LOSE JOHN G, et al) [A] 1-3,5,8 * column 7, line 27 - line 67; figure - * [X] 10; | [AX]JPS6310099 ; | [AX]JPH09295191 ; | [A]GB2168914 (WARNKE UMFORMTECH VEB K) [A] 1,5,6 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970530), vol. 1997, no. 05, & JP09010998 A 19970114 (AIDA ENG LTD) [Y] 4 * abstract * | [AX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880614), vol. 012, no. 206, Database accession no. (M - 708), & JP63010099 A 19880116 (KOMATSU LTD) [A] 1-3,5,8 * abstract * [X] 10 | [AX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980227), vol. 1998, no. 03, & JP09295191 A 19971118 (AMADA CO LTD) [A] 1-3,5,8 * abstract * [X] 10 |