EP1176593 - Information recording apparatus and information recording method, and information recording medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.05.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.07.2008 [2008/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 4-1, Meguro 1-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/05] | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 4-1 Meguro 1-chome Meguro-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakahara, Masanori, c/o Pioneer Corporation Tokorozawa Works, No. 2610 Hanazono 4-chome Tokorozawa-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 02 /
Sawabe, Takao, c/o Pioneer Corporation Tokorozawa Works, No. 2610 Hanazono 4-chome Tokorozawa-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | [2002/05] | Representative(s) | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/05] | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 01305543.9 | 26.06.2001 | [2002/05] | Priority number, date | JP20000193401 | 27.06.2000 Original published format: JP 2000193401 | [2002/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1176593 | Date: | 30.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1176593 | Date: | 16.07.2003 | [2003/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G11B27/034, G11B27/32, G11B20/12, G11B20/10, G11B27/34 | [2002/05] | CPC: |
G11B27/034 (EP,US);
G11B27/031 (KR);
G06F3/06 (KR);
G11B20/10 (EP,US);
G11B27/105 (EP,US);
G11B27/329 (EP,US);
G11B27/34 (EP,US);
G11B2220/216 (EP,US);
G11B2220/218 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2562 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/05] | Title | German: | Informationsaufzeichnungsgerät und Verfahren und Informationsaufzeichnungsmedium | [2002/05] | English: | Information recording apparatus and information recording method, and information recording medium | [2002/05] | French: | Appareil et procédé d'enregistrement d'informations et milieu d'enregistrement d'informations | [2002/05] | Examination procedure | 16.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/38] | 15.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/27] | 11.01.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0929072 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1,4,9,12,15,17,20,23,24 * paragraphs [0604]-[0642] *; | [PA]EP1052644 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [PA] 1,4,9,12,15,17,20,23,24 * sections [0511] - [0535] * A: & WO9938167 * |