EP1170027 - A method for vascular access devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.08.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.10.2004 [2004/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETHICON, INC. U.S. Route 22 Somerville, New Jersey 08876 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/02] | For all designated states ETHICON, INC. U.S. Route 22 Somerville New Jersey 08876 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kafrawy, Adel 16 Cooke Ave. Kingston, MA 02364 / US | 02 /
Onwumere, Fidelis 91423 Daubury Dr. Mansfield, TX 76063 / US | 03 /
Kovalic, Gerald 920 Midland Creek Dr. Southlake, TX 76092 / US | 04 /
Solomon, Donald 900 Nottingham Circle Southlake, TX 76092 / US | [2002/02] | Representative(s) | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/02] | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 01305573.6 | 27.06.2001 | [2002/02] | Priority number, date | US20000605772 | 28.06.2000 Original published format: US 605772 | [2002/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1170027 | Date: | 09.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/06 | [2002/02] | CPC: |
A61M25/0606 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2002/39] |
Former [2002/02] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren für vaskuläre Vorrichtungen | [2002/02] | English: | A method for vascular access devices | [2002/02] | French: | Procédé pour dispositifs d'accès vasculaires | [2002/02] | Examination procedure | 14.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/33] | 19.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/42] | 03.05.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2004 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2164363 (COSTA ALLAN) [A] 1,8 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9420279 (STEVENS SMITH & BARTLETT PTY L [AU], et al) [A] 1,8 * abstract *; | [A]EP0826387 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON MEDICAL [US]) [A] 1,8 * abstract *; | [PXA]EP1034811 (ETHICON INC [US]) [PX] 8-10 * page 5, line 13 - line 27; figure 4 *[A] 1,2,4 | Examination | US4722344 | WO9000960 |