EP1170691 - System and method for an efficient dynamic multi-unit auction [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.10.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ausubel, Lawrence 2920 Garfield Terrace NW Washington, DC 20008 / US | [2002/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/02] | Representative(s) | Whitten, George Alan, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/02] | Whitten, George Alan, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co., 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01305804.5 | 05.07.2001 | [2002/02] | Priority number, date | US20000216338P | 05.07.2000 Original published format: US 216338 P | US20000229600P | 05.09.2000 Original published format: US 229600 P | US20010293510P | 29.05.2001 Original published format: US 293510 P | US20010294246P | 31.05.2001 Original published format: US 294246 P | [2002/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1170691 | Date: | 09.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60 | [2002/02] | CPC: |
G06Q30/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/02] | Title | German: | System und Verfahren für eine leistungsfähige und dynamische Auktion von mehreren Gegenständen | [2002/02] | English: | System and method for an efficient dynamic multi-unit auction | [2002/02] | French: | Système et méthode pour une enchère multiple dynamique et efficace | [2002/02] | Examination procedure | 04.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/36] | 29.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.04.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/45] | 13.06.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2007 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No Search |