EP1172778 - Security alert apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.01.2006 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2010 | Change - representative | published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Exact Security Limited 54-56 Victoria Street, Shirebrook Mansfield Nottinghamshire NG20 8AQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/22] | For all designated states Exact Security Limited 54-56 Victoria Street, Shirebrook Mansfield, Nottinghamshire NG20 8AQ / GB | ||
Former [2002/03] | For all designated states Belk, Jonathan Simone Greenfields Calver Bridge, Hope Valley S32 3XA / GB | ||
For all designated states Wood, Victor Lamb Hall, 127 Woodvilla Road, Hartshorne Swalincote, Derbyshire DE11 7EX / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/03] | Representative(s) | Wilson Gunn Blackfriars House The Parsonage 5th Floor Manchester M3 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/34] | Wilson Gunn 5th Floor Blackfriars House The Parsonage Manchester M3 2JA / GB | ||
Former [2002/03] | Middlemist, Ian Alastair, et al Wilson Gunn M'Caw, 41-51 Royal Exchange, Cross Street Manchester, M2 7BD / GB | Application number, filing date | 01306004.1 | 12.07.2001 | [2002/03] | Priority number, date | GB20000017334 | 15.07.2000 Original published format: GB 0017334 | [2002/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1172778 | Date: | 16.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1172778 | Date: | 05.03.2003 | [2003/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G08B13/14, G08B21/02 | [2002/03] | CPC: |
G08B21/0222 (EP);
G08B13/1427 (EP);
G08B21/0227 (EP);
G08B21/023 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/03] | Title | German: | Sicherheitswarnungsvorrichtung | [2002/03] | English: | Security alert apparatus | [2002/03] | French: | Appareil d'alerte de sécurité | [2002/03] | Examination procedure | 03.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/46] | 02.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.08.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/09] | 20.09.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2003 | 03   M06   Not yet paid | 31.07.2004 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   29.12.2004 | 31.07.2005 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO8706748 (F B NUTTER ENTERPRISES INC D B [US]) [Y] 1-6 * page 1, line 13 - line 17 * * page 4, line 1 - line 4 * * page 5, line 22 - line 25 * * page 14, line 8 - line 10 * * page 29, line 5 - line 16 *; | [Y]US5686887 (CHEN SIDNEY YIU KWOK [US], et al) [Y] 1-6 * column 1, line 17 - line 28 * * column 2, line 6 - line 34 * * column 3, line 16 - line 32 * * column 14, line 43 - line 52 * * column 21, line 34 - line 35 * |