EP1177992 - Ratcheting drive for conveyors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.10.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.12.2004 [2004/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Unova IP Corp. 21900 Burbank Boulevard Woodland Hills CA 91367-7418 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/06] | For all designated states Unova IP Corp. 21900 Burbank Boulevard Woodland Hills, CA 91367-7418 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McNamara, Jason A. 1129-17th Street Wyandotte, MI 48192 / US | 02 /
Brown, Gerald A. 25601 Packard Roseville, MI 48066 / US | [2002/06] | Representative(s) | Forsyth, Helen Jane, et al Nash Matthews LLP 24 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1JP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/06] | Forsyth, Helen Jane, et al Keith W Nash & Co, 90-92 Regent Street Cambridge CB2 1DP / GB | Application number, filing date | 01306023.1 | 12.07.2001 | [2002/06] | Priority number, date | US20000628890 | 31.07.2000 Original published format: US 628890 | [2002/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1177992 | Date: | 06.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B65G23/40, F16D41/12 | [2002/06] | CPC: |
F16D41/12 (EP,US);
B65G23/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, SE [2002/43] |
Former [2002/06] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Ratschenantrieb für Förderer | [2002/06] | English: | Ratcheting drive for conveyors | [2002/06] | French: | Entraînement à cliquet pour convoyeurs | [2002/06] | Examination procedure | 14.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/17] | 10.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/49] | 01.07.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2004/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2004 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4619141 (YOSHIEDA KEIICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-14* the whole document *; | [X]US5836437 (SAITO KOJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5,10,13,14 * column 6, line 47 - column 8, line 10; figures 1,6 * |