EP1173019 - Apparatus and method for processing description information of multimedia data [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.02.2010 Database last updated on 24.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.03.2010 [2010/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 20, Yoido-dong, Youngdungpo-ku Seoul / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/17] | For all designated states LG ELECTRONICS INC. 20, Yoido-dong, Youngdungpo-ku Seoul / KR | ||
Former [2002/03] | For all designated states LG ELECTRONICS INC. 20, Yoido-dong, Youngdungpo-gu Seoul / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Jin Soo Samho Apt. 101-809, 136, Keoyu-1 Dong Songpa-Ku, Seoul / KR | 02 /
Song, Jung Min Jukong Apt 6-203, Banpobon-Dong Seocho-Ku, Seoul / KR | 03 /
Yoon, Kyoung Ro Yuksam MBC Apt 3-1205, Dogock-2 Dong Kangnam-Ku, Seoul / KR | [2002/03] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/40] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2009/03] | Cabinet Plasseraud 65/67 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2002/03] | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 01306111.4 | 16.07.2001 | [2002/03] | Priority number, date | KR20000040591 | 14.07.2000 Original published format: KR 2000040591 | [2002/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1173019 | Date: | 16.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1173019 | Date: | 02.05.2003 | [2003/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1173019 | Date: | 22.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/173, H04N7/16 | [2003/18] | CPC: |
H04N21/84 (EP,US);
G06F3/14 (KR);
G06F16/435 (EP,US);
G06F16/48 (EP,US);
H04N21/25891 (EP,US);
H04N21/44222 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/466 (EP,US);
H04N21/4667 (EP,US);
H04N21/6582 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2002/03] | H04N7/173 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2004/04] |
Former [2002/03] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Gerät und Verfahren zur Verarbeitung von Beschreibungsinformationen für Multimediadaten | [2002/03] | English: | Apparatus and method for processing description information of multimedia data | [2002/03] | French: | Appareil et procédé de traitement de l'information descriptive de données multimédia | [2002/03] | Examination procedure | 30.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/01] | 18.11.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2008 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 05.11.2008 | 13.10.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 05.11.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.11.2008 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 14.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 11.03.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]WO9921338 (THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS [US]) [Y] 1,21,24,26 * page 3, line 24 - page 4, line 31 * * page 8, line 13 - page 16, line 30 * [A] 2-20,22,23,25,27-29; | [YA]US5754939 (HERZ FREDERICK S M [US], et al) [Y] 1,21,24,26 * the whole document * [A] 2-20,22,23,25,27-29; | [A]US5973683 (CRAGUN BRIAN JOHN [US], et al) [A] 1-29 * abstract * |