EP1181915 - Disposable pull-on diaper [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.2008 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Unicharm Corporation 182 Shimobun Kinsei-cho Shikokuchuo-shi Ehime 799-0111 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/03] | For all designated states UNI-CHARM CORPORATION 182 Shimobun, Kinsei-cho Shikokuchuo-shi Ehime-ken / JP | ||
Former [2004/24] | For all designated states Uni-Charm Corporation 182 Shimobun, Kinsei-cho Shikokuchuo-shi, Ehime-ken / JP | ||
Former [2002/09] | For all designated states UNI-CHARM CORPORATION 182 Shimobun, Kinsei-cho Kawanoe-shi Ehime-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shimada, Takaaki, Technical Center 1531-7 Takasuka, Wadahama, Toyohama-cho Mitoyo-gun, Kagawa-ken 769-1602 / JP | 02 /
Suzuki, Seiji, Technical Center 1531-7 Takasuka, Wadahama, Toyohama-cho Mitoyo-gun, Kagawa-ken 769-1602 / JP | [2002/09] | Representative(s) | Parry, Christopher Stephen Saunders & Dolleymore 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford, Herts. WD18 0JU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/09] | Parry, Christopher Stephen Saunders & Dolleymore, 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford, Herts. WD18 0JU / GB | Application number, filing date | 01306146.0 | 17.07.2001 | [2002/09] | Priority number, date | JP20000297573 | 24.08.2000 Original published format: JP 2000297573 | [2002/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1181915 | Date: | 27.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1181915 | Date: | 17.12.2003 | [2003/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1181915 | Date: | 16.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/496, A61F13/551, A61F13/15 | [2002/09] | CPC: |
A61F13/496 (EP,US);
A61F13/72 (KR);
A61F13/5512 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/09] | Title | German: | Wegwerfhöschen | [2002/09] | English: | Disposable pull-on diaper | [2002/09] | French: | Couche-culotte jetable | [2002/09] | Examination procedure | 07.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/24] | 16.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.11.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 15.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.01.2008 | BE | 16.01.2008 | CH | 16.01.2008 | CY | 16.01.2008 | DK | 16.01.2008 | FI | 16.01.2008 | IT | 16.01.2008 | LI | 16.01.2008 | TR | 16.01.2008 | GR | 17.04.2008 | ES | 27.04.2008 | PT | 16.06.2008 | IE | 17.07.2008 | LU | 17.07.2008 | MC | 31.07.2008 | [2010/47] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 16.01.2008 | |
BE | 16.01.2008 | ||
CH | 16.01.2008 | ||
CY | 16.01.2008 | ||
DK | 16.01.2008 | ||
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
IT | 16.01.2008 | ||
LI | 16.01.2008 | ||
TR | 16.01.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
IE | 17.07.2008 | ||
LU | 17.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 16.01.2008 | |
BE | 16.01.2008 | ||
CH | 16.01.2008 | ||
CY | 16.01.2008 | ||
DK | 16.01.2008 | ||
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
IT | 16.01.2008 | ||
LI | 16.01.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
IE | 17.07.2008 | ||
LU | 17.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 16.01.2008 | |
BE | 16.01.2008 | ||
CH | 16.01.2008 | ||
CY | 16.01.2008 | ||
DK | 16.01.2008 | ||
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
IT | 16.01.2008 | ||
LI | 16.01.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
IE | 17.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 16.01.2008 | |
BE | 16.01.2008 | ||
CH | 16.01.2008 | ||
CY | 16.01.2008 | ||
DK | 16.01.2008 | ||
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
LI | 16.01.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
IE | 17.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/33] | AT | 16.01.2008 | |
BE | 16.01.2008 | ||
CH | 16.01.2008 | ||
CY | 16.01.2008 | ||
DK | 16.01.2008 | ||
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
LI | 16.01.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/18] | AT | 16.01.2008 | |
BE | 16.01.2008 | ||
CH | 16.01.2008 | ||
DK | 16.01.2008 | ||
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
LI | 16.01.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 16.01.2008 | |
BE | 16.01.2008 | ||
CH | 16.01.2008 | ||
DK | 16.01.2008 | ||
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
LI | 16.01.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | AT | 16.01.2008 | |
BE | 16.01.2008 | ||
CH | 16.01.2008 | ||
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
LI | 16.01.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | AT | 16.01.2008 | |
CH | 16.01.2008 | ||
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
LI | 16.01.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 16.01.2008 | |
CH | 16.01.2008 | ||
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
LI | 16.01.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | CH | 16.01.2008 | |
LI | 16.01.2008 | ||
ES | 27.04.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH11137602 ; | [A]US4911702 (O'LEARY AUDREY A [US], et al) [A] * figure -; claim - *; | [A]US5531732 (WOOD LEIGH E [US]) [A] 1,4* figure -; claim - * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990831), vol. 1999, no. 10, & JP11137602 A 19990525 (KAO CORP) [A] 1,3,4 * abstract * |